Horn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Richard Allen Hunt and Richard Allen Horn
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv01264
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Commissioner of Social Security answer/response due 11/15/2019. (AE)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Justin L. Martin filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security re #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Justin)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint , filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/9/2019, (Martin, Justin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Justin Lane Martin on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Martin, Justin)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Commissioner of Social Security on 8/19/2019 (Osterhout, Karl)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Karl E Osterhout for Plaintiff Richard Allen Horn, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 17, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Karl E. Osterhout FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Richard Allen Horn (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5889911 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Dellert, Christopher)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security, OGC. (Attachments: #1 Summons USAG, #2 Summons US ATTY)(TF)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Richard Allen Horn.(TF)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. The Clerk shall issue summonses. (TF)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida. (AE)
August 13, 2019 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (GT)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Richard Allen Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons SSA, Office of the General Counsel, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #5 Summons Seattle U.S. Attorney's Office)(Dellert, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Allen Hunt
Represented By: Christopher H Dellert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Allen Horn
Represented By: Christopher H Dellert
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Represented By: Justin Lane Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?