Bergman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tamsin Marie Bergman and Tamsin Bergman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
In Re: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv01266
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Heather L Griffith on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Griffith, Heather)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Tamsin Marie Bergman.(MW) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/20/2019) (MW). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2019: #1 SEALED Exhibit) (MW).
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(MW)(cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Tamsin Marie Bergman. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bergman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Represented By: Heather L Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamsin Marie Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamsin Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?