Amazon.com Inc v. Bowser
Petitioner: Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Inc
Respondent: Katrina Deutsch Bowser
Case Number: 2:2019cv01268
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Electronically Issued as to Respondent Katrina Deutsch Bowser (PM)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Petition (Other) by Petitioner Amazon.com Inc (Miller, Robert)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/21/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/7/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/15/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Robert Miller re #1 Petition (Other) by Petitioner Amazon.com Inc (Miller, Robert)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Robert E Miller. Filed by Petitioner Amazon.com Inc. (Miller, Robert)
August 13, 2019 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (GT)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon.com, Inc. (Miller, Robert)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Receipt # 0981-5881841), filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Order)(Miller, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazon.com Inc v. Bowser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: John Goldmark
Represented By: Robert E Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: John Goldmark
Represented By: Robert E Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Katrina Deutsch Bowser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?