Sparks v. Textron Inc
Plaintiff: Anthony Sparks
Defendant: Textron, Inc. and Textron Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01269
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: At the request of the parties, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 11/21/2019. All other FRCP 26-related deadlines are adjusted accordingly. Failure to adhere to these deadlines may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/21/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/7/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/15/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #3 Verification of State Court Records, #1 Notice of Removal, (Supplemental) by Defendant Textron Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Dec of Service (Summons and Complaint), #3 Exhibit Dec of Service (Summons and Complaint))(Oppenheim, Mary)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER Amending Complaint re parties' #11 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation Amending Complaint is accepted. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Amending Complaint by parties (Frank, Steven)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Anthony Sparks (Frank, Steven)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint; by Textron Inc.(Oppenheim, Mary)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Anthony Sparks re #1 Notice of Removal, (Frank, Steven)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Textron Inc. (Oppenheim, Mary)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
August 13, 2019 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (GT)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Textron, Inc. (Oppenheim, Mary)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Textron, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order Setting Case Sch)(Oppenheim, Mary)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Filing re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Textron, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Oppenheim, Mary)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-19282-8 KNT; (Receipt # 0981-5882143) Attorney Mary Quinn Oppenheim added to party Textron, Inc.(pty:dft), filed by Textron, Inc..(Oppenheim, Mary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2019: #1 Complaint) (GT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparks v. Textron Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Quinn Oppenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron Inc
Represented By: Alexander A Baehr
Represented By: Mary Quinn Oppenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Sparks
Represented By: Steven Bert Frank
Represented By: Anne E. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?