Short v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Carla Short
Defendant: TWC The Valve Company, L.L.C., Flowserve US Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., ITT Corporation, Dorr Ventures, Inc., Velan Valve Corp, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, General Electric Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, The Wm. Powell Company, Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Crane Co., Warren Pumps, LLC, CBS Corporation, Weir Valve & Controls USA Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Dorr Ventures Inc, Flowserve US Inc, Electrolux Home Products Inc, FL Smidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc., IMO Industries Inc, The WM Powell Company, TWC The Valve Company LLC, Crane Co, Weir Valve & Controls USA Inc, Warren Pumps LLC and Spirax Sarco Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01270
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Crane Co (Shaw, G)
October 10, 2019 Filing 45 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, First Amended by Crane Co.(Shaw, G)
October 10, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney G William Shaw on behalf of Defendant Crane Co. (Shaw, G)
October 9, 2019 Filing 43 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Warren Pumps LLC.(Eraut, Allen)
October 9, 2019 Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (First Amended) with JURY DEMAND by CBS Corporation.(Marks, Christopher)
October 9, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erica L Bergmann on behalf of Plaintiff Carla Short. (Bergmann, Erica)
October 8, 2019 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company (Tuvim, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Tuvim, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark B Tuvim on behalf of Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Tuvim, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Velan Inc for Velan Valve Corp. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Velan Valve Corp (Tuvim, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Velan Valve Corp.(Tuvim, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark B Tuvim on behalf of Defendant Velan Valve Corp. (Tuvim, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survivorship with JURY DEMAND by Weir Valve & Controls USA Inc.(Kopij, Dana)
October 7, 2019 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc., Other Affiliate Gamco Investors, Inc. for CBS Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by CBS Corporation (Serko, Alice)
October 7, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Flowserve US Inc, Union Carbide Corporation and CBS Corporation must file separate Corporate Disclosure Statements by 10/15/2019. (SP)
October 4, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher S Marks on behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation. (Marks, Christopher)
October 2, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachel Tallon Reynolds on behalf of Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Reynolds, Rachel)
October 2, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachel Tallon Reynolds on behalf of Defendant Flowserve US Inc. (Reynolds, Rachel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling, LLC for IMO Industries Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by IMO Industries Inc (Horne, James)
September 27, 2019 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by General Electric Company (Serko, Alice)
September 27, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (First Amended) with JURY DEMAND by General Electric Company.(Serko, Alice)
September 27, 2019 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ITT Corporation (Gardner, Ronald)
September 27, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by ITT Corporation.(Gardner, Ronald)
September 27, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ronald C Gardner on behalf of Defendant ITT Corporation. (Gardner, Ronald)
September 27, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, IMO Industries Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/4/2019. (ERA)
September 26, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, The Wm. Powell Company's Answer and Affirmative Defenses by The WM Powell Company.(Hicks, James)
September 26, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James Edward Horne on behalf of Defendant IMO Industries Inc. (Horne, James)
September 25, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The WM Powell Company (Hicks, James)
September 25, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent MetLife Inc for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Gawlowski, Richard) Modified on 10/7/2019 (SP).
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Warren Pumps LLC. no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Warren Pumps LLC (Eraut, Allen) Modified on 9/26/2019 (ERA).
September 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allen Eraut on behalf of Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Eraut, Allen)
September 24, 2019 Attorney Tyler J Hermsen for Weir Valve & Controls USA Inc added per #16 Notice of Appearance. (ERA)
September 24, 2019 Attorney Brian Bernard Smith for The WM Powell Company added per #15 Notice of Appearance. (ERA)
September 24, 2019 Attorney Alice Coles Serko for General Electric Company added per #13 Notice of Appearance. (ERA)
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Weir Group PLC, a United Kingdom company for Weir Valve & Controls USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Weir Valve & Controls USA Inc (Kopij, Dana)
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dana C Kopij on behalf of Defendant Weir Valve & Controls USA Inc. (Kopij, Dana)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James D Hicks on behalf of Defendant The WM Powell Company. (Hicks, James)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Richard G Gawlowski on behalf of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Gawlowski, Richard)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher S Marks on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company. (Marks, Christopher)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant FL Smidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc. (SP)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Carla Short with JURY DEMAND, filed by Carla Short. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Draper, Glenn) Modified on 9/19/2019 (SP).
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Tuvim, Mark)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Tuvim, Mark)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark B Tuvim on behalf of Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Tuvim, Mark)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required: The incorrect divisional office was selected upon case opening. This case is now assigned a Tacoma judge. All future documents shall bear the following case number: 2:19-cv-1270-DWC. ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT) Modified on 8/13/2019 to add info to docket text (KB).
August 13, 2019 Judge David W. Christel added. (GT)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Flowserve US Inc and ITT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GT)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summonses Electronically Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons)(GT)
August 13, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Justin Olson on behalf of Plaintiff Carla Short. (Olson, Justin)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Glenn S Draper on behalf of Plaintiff Carla Short. (Draper, Glenn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5882218), filed by Carla Short. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons)(Draper, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Short v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWC The Valve Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorr Ventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wm. Powell Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Represented By: Taryn M Basauri
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard G Gawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valve & Controls USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorr Ventures Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Represented By: Randy J Aliment
Represented By: Taryn M Basauri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FL Smidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: James Edward Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The WM Powell Company
Represented By: James D Hicks
Represented By: Brian Bernard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWC The Valve Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Represented By: G William Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valve & Controls USA Inc
Represented By: Tyler J Hermsen
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Short
Represented By: Glenn S Draper
Represented By: Erica L Bergmann
Represented By: Justin Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?