Pacific 1 LLC
Plaintiff: Pacific 1 LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01271
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:183
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Ex Parte Motion to Hold Action in Abeyance. On or before October 31, 2019, Limitation Plaintiff shall advise the Court of the status of the settlement of the claims. If settlement is not reached by that date, the Court will decide how to proceed at that time. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
August 14, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (GT)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Hold Action in Abeyance , filed by Plaintiff Pacific 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/13/2019, (Barcott, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pacific 1 LLC (Barcott, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Posting of Security for Costs ; filed by Plaintiff Pacific 1 LLC. (Barcott, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from and/or Limitation of Liability against defendant(s) Pacific 1 LLC (Receipt # 0981-5883076) Attorney Michael A Barcott added to party Pacific 1 LLC(pty:pla), filed by Pacific 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barcott, Michael) Modified on 8/13/2019 to remove "defendant" language (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific 1 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific 1 LLC
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Barcott
Represented By: Michael A Barcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?