Sound Commercial Investment Holdings LLC v. Loeb Auction Services Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sound Commercial Investment Holdings, Inc. and Sound Commercial Investment Holdings LLC
Defendant: Heritage Global Partners, Inc., Loeb Auction Services Group LLC dba Loeb Winternitz Industrial Auctioneers, Loeb Auction Services Group LLC and Heritage Global Partners Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01275
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SECOND AMENDED ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 12/16/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 10/3/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Sound Commercial Investment Holdings LLC (St Romain, Jacque)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Heritage Global Inc. for Heritage Global Partners Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Heritage Global Partners Inc (Esler, Brian)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Sound Commercial Investment Holdings LLC (St Romain, Jacque)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Sound Commerical Investment Holdings Inc and Heritage Global Partners Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/21/2019. (GT)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
August 14, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Loeb Auction Services Group LLC dba Loeb Winternitz Industrial Auctioneers (Matheson, Christopher)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Loeb Equipment Supply Company for Loeb Auction Services Group LLC dba Loeb Winternitz Industrial Auctioneers. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Loeb Auction Services Group LLC dba Loeb Winternitz Industrial Auctioneers (Matheson, Christopher) Modified on 8/14/2019 (KB).
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Plaintiff re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Loeb Auction Services Group LLC dba Loeb Winternitz Industrial Auctioneers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Notice to Superior Court of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Matheson, Christopher) Modified on 8/14/2019 (KB).
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-20123-1-SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5884491) Attorney Christopher A. Matheson added to party Loeb Auction Services Group LLC dba Loeb Winternitz Industrial Auctioneers (pty:dft), filed by Loeb Auction Services Group LLC dba Loeb Winternitz Industrial Auctioneers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Matheson, Christopher) Modified on 8/14/2019 (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sound Commercial Investment Holdings LLC v. Loeb Auction Services Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Global Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Valera
Represented By: Brian William Esler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loeb Auction Services Group LLC dba Loeb Winternitz Industrial Auctioneers
Represented By: Christopher A. Matheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loeb Auction Services Group LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. Matheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Global Partners Inc
Represented By: Nicholas Valera
Represented By: Brian William Esler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sound Commercial Investment Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jacque Elizabeth St Romain
Represented By: Jose Dino Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sound Commercial Investment Holdings LLC
Represented By: Jacque Elizabeth St Romain
Represented By: Jose Dino Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?