WAG Acquisition LLC v. Flying Crocodile Inc et al
Plaintiff: WAG Acquisition LLC
Defendant: Flying Crocodile Inc, Does 1-20, Streamates Limited, ICF Technology Inc, FCI Inc, Accretive Technology Group Inc and Riser Apps LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01278
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER re #181 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David G. Liston for WAG Acquisition LLC by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER re #179 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Mord Michael Lewis for WAG Acquisition LLC by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 3, 2019 Filing 181 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David G. Liston FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5951864 (Fogg, Steven)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER re #176 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ronald Abramson for Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 3, 2019 Filing 179 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mord Michael Lewis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5951803 (Fogg, Steven)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER re #175 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alex G Patchen for Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER re #174 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ari J. Jaffess for Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 3, 2019 Filing 176 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ronald Abramson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5951774 (Fogg, Steven)
October 3, 2019 Filing 175 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alex G. Patchen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5951740 (Fogg, Steven)
October 3, 2019 Filing 174 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ari J. Jaffess FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5951710 (Fogg, Steven)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura. The Honorable J. Richard Creatura is no longer associated with this matter. (KAM)
August 27, 2019 Filing 172 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 9/3/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
August 26, 2019 Filing 171 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Eric A Lindberg on behalf of Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC. (Lindberg, Eric)
August 26, 2019 Filing 170 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Steven W Fogg on behalf of Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC. (Fogg, Steven)
August 14, 2019 Filing 169 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from District of New Jersey and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
August 14, 2019 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (GT)
August 14, 2019 Filing 168 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey, Case Number 2:14-cv-02674.
August 13, 2019 *** Civil Case Terminated *** (dam, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #153 Report and Recommendations. etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/13/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 166 OPINION Adopting Report and Recommendation. etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/13/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 165 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #164 Order,. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER that by March 28, 2019, the parties shall submit to the Court a joint status report that sets forth: the discovery that remains to be completed in each case, proposed deadlines for the completion of discovery, service of expert reports and the completion of all expert discovery; that there will be a telephone status conference in these matters on April 23, 2019 at 11:30 a.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/14/2019. (ld, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW and ORDER granting #161 Motion to Seal Document #153 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/7/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW and ORDER granting #160 Motion to Seal Document #154 Objection to Report and Recommendations. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/7/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #161 MOTION to Seal Document. Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 161 MOTION to Seal Document #153 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #10 Amended Complaint filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Appendix - Index Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(3), #3 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Findings of Fact, #4 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #160 MOTION to Seal Document. Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 160 MOTION to Seal Document #154 Objection to Report and Recommendations,, #159 Response (NOT Motion),, by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Redacted Objections to Report & Recommendation, #3 Redacted Response to Objections, #4 Appendix - Index Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(3), #5 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Findings of Fact, #6 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 159 RESPONSE re #154 Objection to Report and Recommendations,,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #157 MOTION to Seal Document #153 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #10 Amended Complaint filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. . Motion set for 12/17/2018 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mfr, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 179 Motion to Seal, 175 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in case 2:14-cv-2340-ES-MAH, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.; Any renewed motion to seal shall be filed no later than December 14, 2018, etc. re #157 MOTION to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/26/2018. (dam, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 157 MOTION to Seal Document #153 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #10 Amended Complaint filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Redacted Version of Document to Be Sealed, #3 Proposed Findings of Fact, #4 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER Granting #155 Letter from Ronald Abramson re Unopposed Request for Extension to until 11/28/2018 to File Response re: #154 Objection to Report and Recommendations,,.. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 14-2674. (JB, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 155 Letter from Ronald Abramson re Unopposed Request for Extension to File Response re #154 Objection to Report and Recommendations,,. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 154 OBJECTION to #153 Report and Recommendations by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 153 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #10 Amended Complaint filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. Objections, if any, to R&R due by 11/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/22/2018. (ld, ) Modified on 8/13/2019 (dam, ). [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 152 NOTICE by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF JENNIFER K. SHEFFIELD, ESQ. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 LETTER ORDER terminating Defendants' #139 Motion to Dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction, or alternatively, to dismiss for improper venue, or to transfer, etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 6/29/2018. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Oral Argument Conference held on 3/28/2018. (ECR) (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 150 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 TEXT ORDER: Oral Argument set for 3/28/2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/28/2018. (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSION OF LAW/ORDER granting #146 Motion to Seal #143 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, #142 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #140 Brief,,, Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/27/18. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
February 13, 2018 Filing 147 NOTICE by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF ADRIANE M. SCOLA, ESQ. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
January 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #146 MOTION to Seal Document #143 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, #142 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #140 Brief,,,, . Motion set for 2/20/2018 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
January 16, 2018 Filing 146 MOTION to Seal Document #143 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, #142 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #140 Brief,,,, by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order, #3 Proposed Redactions to Brief in Support of Motion, #4 Proposed Redactions to Brief in Opposition to Motion, #5 Proposed Redactions to Reply Brief in Support of Motion, #6 Exhibit 11 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #7 Exhibit 12 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #8 Exhibit 13 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #9 Exhibit 14 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #10 Exhibit 16 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #11 Exhibit 17 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #12 Exhibit 18 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #13 Exhibit 20 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #14 Exhibit 21 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #15 Exhibit 22 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #16 Exhibit 23 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #17 Exhibit 24 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #18 Exhibit 26 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #19 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting Pltf's letter request for a one-week extension of time, to 1/16/18, to file a motion to seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/10/18. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
January 9, 2018 Filing 144 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
December 26, 2017 Filing 143 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC re #139 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
December 19, 2017 Filing 142 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #139 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 27, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #139 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 12/18/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 141 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC re #139 MOTION to Dismiss , #140 Brief,,,, (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 140 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS [ECF NO. 139] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin T. Quinn, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 139 MOTION to Dismiss by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shawn Boday, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER that the pending motions to dismiss or transfer under 1406(a) is terminated without prejudice, as follows: WAG Acquisition, LLC v. Multi-Media, LLC, Civil Action No. 14-2340 (ES), D.E. 153; WAG Acquisition, LLC v. Data Conversions, Inc., Civil Action No. 14-2345 (ES), D.E. 140; WAG Acquisition, LLC v. Flying Crocodile, Inc., Civil Action No. 14-2674 (ES), D.E. 131; WAG Acquisition, LLC v. Gattyn Group S..r.l., Civil Action No. 14-2832 (ES), D.E. 140; WAG Acquisition, LLC v. Friendfinder Networks, Inc., Civil Action No. 14-3456 (ES), D.E. 138; WAG Acquisition, LLC v. Vubeology, Inc., Civil Action No. 14-4531 (ES), D.E. 116; WAG Acquisition, LLC v. Webpower, Inc., Civil Action No. 15-3581 (ES), D.E. 104; that Defendants shall make any motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter, and to dismiss or transfer for improper venue under 1406(a) on or before November 22, 2017; any opposition shall be filed by December 19, 2017; any reply shall be filed by December 26, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/2/17. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 137 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 136 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC re #131 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin T. Quinn, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 23, 2017 Filing 135 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. enclosing the parties Joint Claim Construction Statement. (Attachments: #1 Joint Claim Construction Statement, #2 Exhibit A and B)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 134 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #131 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mord M. Lewis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting parties request for an extension of Claim Construction deadlines, as set forth. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/3/17. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 31, 2017 Filing 132 Letter from Ari J. Jaffess regarding Joint Request for Extension of Claim Construction Deadlines. (JAFFESS, ARI) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 31, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #131 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. Motion set for 8/21/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 28, 2017 Filing 131 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Justin T. Quinn, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B (Part 1), #5 Exhibit B (Part 2), #6 Declaration of Shawn Boday, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 12, 2017 Filing 130 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #120 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/5/2017. (ld, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 30, 2017 Filing 128 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting Deft's Letter Request for a three-week extension of all claim construction deadlines, as set forth in the chart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/29/17. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 28, 2017 Filing 126 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER ON INFORMAL APPL. that fact discovery is extended until July 13, 2017 for the limited purpose of taking Mr. Perkinss deposition; all other fact discovery shall be fully completed by the June 30, 2017 deadline; that all other deadlines set forth in the May 18, 2017 Amended Scheduling Order [D.E. 118] remain in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/27/17. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 124 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. raising a discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 20, 2017 Pro Hac Vice fee as to ALEX C. PATCHEN, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW033594 (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting re #121 Letter Request for pro hac vice admission as to ALEX PATCHEN, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/12/17. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 12, 2017 Filing 122 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. raising dispute regarding TC Heartland LLC v. Kraft Foods Group Brands (May 22, 2017). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 121 Letter from Ronald Abramson regarding Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Alex G. Patchen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald Abramson, #2 Declaration of Alex G. Patchen, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #120 MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 7/3/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 120 MOTION to Seal by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of David G. Liston, Esq., #2 Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order, #3 Redacted May 24, 2017 Letter, #4 Redacted Tab A - Proposed Amended Answer to May 24, 2017 Letter, #5 Appendix 1 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #6 Appendix 2 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #7 A1 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #8 A2 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #9 Redacted A3 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #10 Redacted A4 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #11 Redacted A5 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #12 Redacted A6 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #13 A7 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #14 A8 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #15 Redacted A9 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #16 A10 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #17 Redacted A11 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #18 Exhibit D1 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #19 Exhibit D2 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #20 Exhibit D3 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #21 Redacted Ex. D4 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #22 Redacted Ex. D5 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #23 Redacted Ex. D6 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #24 Redacted Ex. D7 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #25 Exhibit D8 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #26 Exhibit D9 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #27 Exhibit D10 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #28 Redacted Ex A (WAG), #29 Exhibit B (WAG), #30 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
May 24, 2017 Filing 119 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Tab A - Proposed Amended Answer, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Appendix 2, #4 A1, #5 A2, #6 A3, #7 A4, #8 A5, #9 A6, #10 A7, #11 A8, #12 A9, #13 A10, #14 A11, #15 Exhibit D1, #16 Exhibit D2, #17 Exhibit D3, #18 Exhibit D4, #19 Exhibit D5, #20 Exhibit D6, #21 Exhibit D7, #22 Exhibit D8, #23 Exhibit D9, #24 Exhibit D10, #25 Exhibit A (WAG), #26 Exhibit B (WAG))(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER FOR AMENDED DISCOVERY PLAN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/18/17. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
May 16, 2017 Filing 117 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. enclosing a proposed Amended Discovery Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #115 Joint Letter Motion re: Discovery Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/30/17. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #115 Joint MOTION Joint Letter Motion regarding Discovery Plan. Motion set for 5/1/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 29, 2017 Filing 115 Joint MOTION Joint Letter Motion regarding Discovery Plan by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's proposed Amended Discovery Plan)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 114 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 TEXT ORDER: The Status Conference set for 2/24/2017 is adjourned without a new date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/21/2017. (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSTIONS OF LAW/ORDER granting #105 Motion to Seal Document #98 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/4/17. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER/LETTER OF REQUEST for International Judicial Assistance pursuant to the 3/18/70 Hague Convention on the taking of evidence abroad in civil or commercial matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/14/16. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
December 12, 2016 Filing 110 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #107 Exhibit (to Document),, #105 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #98 Letter,, #103 Letter,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
December 8, 2016 Filing 109 Letter from Ronald Abramson re #108 Letter. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
December 8, 2016 Filing 108 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
December 7, 2016 Filing 107 Exhibit to #106 Letter by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC. (QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
December 7, 2016 Filing 106 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re 104 Order,. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 29, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #105 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #98 Letter,, #103 Letter,, . Motion set for 1/3/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 29, 2016 Filing 105 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #98 Letter,, #103 Letter,, by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Justin T. Quinn, Esq., #2 Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order, #3 Redacted November 3, 2016 Letter of Defendants, #4 Redacted Ex. A to November 3, 2016 Letter, #5 Redacted November 21, 2016 Letter of Plaintiff, #6 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 TEXT ORDER: The parties are directed to continue to meet and confer regarding Defendants' request that their Letter of Request be signed. If the parties are unable to resolve this matter on their own, they shall appear in the courtroom of the Undersigned on December 8, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. for an in person meet and confer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/22/16. (TAD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 21, 2016 Filing 103 Letter from Ronald Abramson re #98 Letter,,. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 15, 2016 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by MORD MICHAEL LEWIS on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. (LEWIS, MORD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 15, 2016 Filing 101 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #100 Letter. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 14, 2016 Filing 100 Letter from Ari J. Jaffess re #99 Letter, #98 Letter,,. (JAFFESS, ARI) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 14, 2016 Filing 99 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #98 Letter,,. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 3, 2016 Filing 98 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter of Request)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 AMENDED DISCOVERY ORDER, ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/5/2016., Fact Discovery due by 4/21/2017.); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/14/16. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER that Defendants' request that the Court limit the number of claims that Plaintiff can assert is DENIED, and that Plaintiff's request that the Court limit the number of prior art references by Defendants is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/14/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
October 14, 2016 Filing 95 Joint Discovery Plan by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C..(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
October 7, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/7/2016. (ECR) (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/7/2016 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Counsel for plaintiff will initiate the call to 973-776-7858. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/30/2016. (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
September 29, 2016 Text Only Minute Entry for an oral opinion placed on the record re #64 Motion to Bifurcate by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/29/2016. See order #93 . (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #64 Motion to Bifurcate; that liability and damages discovery is bifurcated; that damages discovery is stayed pending the completion of liability discovery and dispositive-motion practice, except that the parties are direct to proceed with any discovery under the Hague Convention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/29/16. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference call scheduled for today is cancelled. A new date and time for the call will be scheduled shortly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/3/16. (TAD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference call scheduled for today is adjourned to Wednesday, August 3, 2016 at 4:00 p.m. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/29/16. (TAD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 28, 2016 Filing 89 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 27, 2016 Filing 92 Transcript of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on July 15, 2016, before Judge Michael A. Hammer. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transciption Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 8/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2016. (mfr) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 15, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Oral Argument held on 7/15/2016 re #64 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery filed by FCI, INC., FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., RISER APPS LLC. Decision Reserved. (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TEXT ORDER: The parties shall forthwith continue to meet & confer in an attempt to resolve the issue raised in their June 23, 2016 letter to the Court. There will be a telephone conference call with counsel on July 29, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. to advise the Court regarding the status of their meet & confer and this outstanding issue. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/15/16. (TAD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 TEXT ORDER : Pursuant to the parties' June 23, 2016 joint letter, the Court adjourns Plaintiff's June 23, 2016 deadline to submit responses to Defendants invalidity contentions and the July 6, 2016 deadline to exchange proposed terms of construction. The parties shall be prepared to discuss the positions and arguments raised in the June 23, 2016 joint letter before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on July 15, 2016. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 7/5/2016. (ps, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 23, 2016 Filing 86 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 TEXT ORDER: There will be Oral Argument on the pending motion to bifurcate #64 on July 15, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/25/16. (TAD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 29, 2016 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JENNIFER K. SHEFFIELD, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 28, 2016 Filing 84 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jennifer K. Sheffield, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7006149.) (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/28/16. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to JENNIFER K. SHEFFIELD, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/24/16. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 23, 2016 Filing 81 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 22, 2016 Filing 80 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. enclosing pro hac vice application of Jennifer K. Sheffield, Esq. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin T. Quinn, Esq., #2 Declaration of Jennifer K. Sheffield, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 17, 2016 Filing 79 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney PHILLIP G. RAY and DAVID A. WARD terminated. Attorney JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN for ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC.,JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN for FCI, INC.,JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN for FLYING CROCODILE, INC.,JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN for ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC.,JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN for RISER APPS LLC,JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN for STREAMATES LIMITED,JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN for STREAMATES LIMITED DBA STREAMATES, LLC added.. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 TEXT ORDER: On or before March 23, 2016, the parties are directed to file a revised discovery confidentiality order consistent with the Court's rulings of March 9, 2016. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/10/16. (Dunican, T) Modified on 3/10/2016 (jqb, ). [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 9, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/9/2016. (ECR) (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 7, 2016 Filing 77 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #64 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (Sur-Reply) (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 TEXT ORDER: Today's Telephone Conference is adjourned to 3/9/2016 at 3:30 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/7/2016. (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting Pltf., WAG's re #73 Letter Request to file sur-reply in further opposition to Defts' Joint Motion to Bifurcate Liability & Damages Disc. not to exceed five (5) pgs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/4/16. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 74 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #73 Letter. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 73 Letter from Ronald Abramson re #64 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 1, 2016 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., FCI, INC., FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, STREAMATES LIMITED, STREAMATES LIMITED DBA STREAMATES, LLC re #64 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (Corrected Signature) (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
March 1, 2016 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The (REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION - D.E. 71) submitted by (D. WARD) on (2/29/16) contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
February 29, 2016 Filing 71 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., FCI, INC., FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, STREAMATES LIMITED, STREAMATES LIMITED DBA STREAMATES, LLC re #64 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 3/7/2016 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/25/2016. (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
February 23, 2016 Filing 69 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re 65 Order,,. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
February 22, 2016 Filing 68 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #64 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting Pltf's re #66 Letter Request for an extension until 2/23/16 to comply w/Text Order to allow the parties to continue to meet & confer in a good-faith attempt to resolve the remaining disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/17/16. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
February 16, 2016 Filing 66 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 TEXT ORDER:The Court has reviewed the parties' February 5, 2016 letter presenting disputes between the parties regarding the form of the Discovery Confidentiality Order. The Court directs the parties to immediately resume their efforts to meet and confer on this dispute. If the parties cannot resolve their issues, then they shall submit, by February 17, 2016, a revised letter presenting any remaining disputes. The revised joint letter also shall explain why the Court's standard Discovery Confidentiality Order (Appendix S to the New Jersey Federal Practice Rules) is insufficient. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/16/16. (Dunican, T) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
February 16, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #64 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery. Motion set for 3/7/2016 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
February 11, 2016 Filing 64 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., FCI, INC., FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
February 8, 2016 Filing 63 Transcript of Proceedings of Scheduling Conference held on January 22, 2016, before Judge MICHAEL A. HAMMER. Court Reporter/Transcriber KING TRANSCRIPTION SERVICES/ Sara L. Kern (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 2/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (ek) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
February 5, 2016 Filing 62 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re: Discovery Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/1/16. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
January 29, 2016 Filing 60 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Joint Discovery Plan)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER purs. to Fed.R.Evid.502(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/26/16. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re: E-Discovery in Patent Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/26/16. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
January 22, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Scheduling Conference held on 1/22/2016. (ECR) (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
January 19, 2016 Filing 57 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. enclosing Joint Discovery Plan, E-Discovery Order, and Rule 502(d) Order. (Attachments: #1 Joint Discovery Plan, #2 Proposed Order re: Electronic Discovery, #3 Proposed Rule 502(d) Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
December 1, 2015 Reset Hearing: The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2015 has been adjourned to 1/22/2016 at 11:00 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 19, 2015 Filing 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RISER APPS LLC identifying Accretive Technology Group, Inc., as Corporate Parent.. (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 19, 2015 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC. identifying Accretive Technology Group, Inc., as Corporate Parent.. (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 19, 2015 Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC.. (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 17, 2015 Filing 53 Letter from Ronald Abramson for Plaintiff WAG re #52 Letter. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 16, 2015 Filing 52 Letter from David Ward. (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 LETTER ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2015 at 12:00 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/13/2015. (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 12, 2015 Filing 50 Letter from Ronald Abramson for Plaintiff WAG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1-PTAB Decision on 011 Patent, #2 Exhibit Ex 2-PTAB Decision on 141 Patent, #3 Exhibit EX 3-PTAB Decision on 611 Patent, #4 Exhibit EX 4-PTAB Decision on 839 Patent)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
November 2, 2015 Filing 49 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC.(WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
October 27, 2015 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #48 Stipulation and Order submitted by STREAMATES LIMITED, STREAMATES LIMITED DBA STREAMATES, LLC, FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, FCI, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/2/15. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME for Defts. to answer Cmp. until 11/2/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/27/15. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
October 23, 2015 Filing 47 Letter from David Ward. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
September 25, 2015 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #46 Order submitted by STREAMATES LIMITED, STREAMATES LIMITED DBA STREAMATES, LLC, FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, FCI, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/26/15. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER EXTENDING TIME for Defts. to answer Cmp. until 10/26/15. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/24/15. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
September 22, 2015 Filing 45 Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. and the Honorable Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 OPINION/ORDER denying #32 Motion to Dismiss; that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate WebPowers motion to dismiss in Civil Action No. 15-3581, D.E. No. 9.; that the parties shall engage in limited jurisdictional discovery regarding the Courts personal jurisdiction over Defendant Coolvision. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/10/15. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 29, 2015 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Motion Hearing held on 7/29/2015 re #32 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss) filed by STREAMATES LIMITED, FCI, INC., FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., RISER APPS LLC. Decision Reserved. (Court Reporter Lynne Johnson.) (ps, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 28, 2015 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILLIP G. RAY on behalf of All Defendants (RAY, PHILLIP) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 7, 2015 Pro Hac Vice counsel, STEVEN B. WINTERS, ADRIANE M. SCOLA and BRIAN G. BODINE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 6, 2015 Filing 41 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Steven Winters, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 6, 2015 Filing 40 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Adriane Scola, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 6, 2015 Filing 39 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Brian Bodine, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 16, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Brian G. Bodine, Esq., Steven B. Winters, Esq., and Adriane M. Scola, Esq: $ 450, receipt number NEW026374 (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ON INFORMAL APPL. granting pro hac vice admission as to Brian G. Bodine, Esq., Steven B. Winters, Esq., and Adriane M. Scola, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/11/15. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 10, 2015 Filing 37 DECLARATION of David Ward (Revised) by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., FCI, INC., FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, STREAMATES LIMITED, STREAMATES LIMITED DBA STREAMATES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Bodine in Support of Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Declaration of Adriane Scola in Support of Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Declaration of Steven Winters in Support of Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 9, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by ARI JASON JAFFESS on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. (JAFFESS, ARI) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
May 28, 2015 Set Hearings: Please be advised that Oral Argument for the pending Motion to Dismiss has been scheduled for 7/29/2015 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5A before Judge Esther Salas. (ps, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
February 23, 2015 Filing 35 DECLARATION in Support of Application for Admissions Pro Hac Vice by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., FCI, INC., FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, STREAMATES LIMITED, STREAMATES LIMITED DBA STREAMATES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian G. Bodine, Esq., #2 Declaration of Steven B. Winters, Esq., #3 Declaration of Adriane M. Scola, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order)(WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
January 13, 2015 Set Deadlines as to #32 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss). Motion set for 2/17/2015 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
January 12, 2015 Filing 34 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., FCI, INC., FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, STREAMATES LIMITED re #32 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss) (Defendants' Joint Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaints) (MILLER, KEITH) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
January 12, 2015 Filing 33 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #32 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald Abramson, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1 to Abramson Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Abramson Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Abramson Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Abramson Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Abramson Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Abramson Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Abramson Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Abramson Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Abramson Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Abramson Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Abramson Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Abramson Declaration, #14 Certificate of Service)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)[Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
January 12, 2015 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss) by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., FCI, INC., FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, STREAMATES LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Leonid Radvinsky, #3 Declaration of Noam Fogel, #4 Declaration of Michael A. Innes, Esq., #5 Exhibit 1 to Innes Declaration, #6 Exhibit 2 to Innes Declaration, #7 Exhibit 3 to Innes Declaration, #8 Exhibit 4 to Innes Declaration, #9 Exhibit 5 to Innes Declaration, #10 Exhibit 6 to Innes Declaration, #11 Exhibit 7 to Innes Declaration, #12 Exhibit 8 to Innes Declaration, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE: parties' briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 10/8/14. (sr, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
October 6, 2014 Filing 30 Letter from All Counsel To Judge Salas Regarding Briefing of Motions To Dismiss. (WETTRE, LEDA) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER consolidating the WAG actions for discovery purposes only & adjourn the Scheduling Cnf. set for November 5, 2014 to a date following a decision on the joint motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 10/6/14. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
September 29, 2014 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Telephone Conference held on 9/29/2014. (ps, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
September 24, 2014 Reset Hearings: Please be advised that the Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/1/2014 has been RESCHEDULED to 11/5/2014 at 12:00 PM before Judge Esther Salas. A Telephone Conference has been scheduled for 9/29/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge Esther Salas. Plaintiffs counsel shall coordinate the call. (ps, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
September 22, 2014 Filing 27 Letter from Ronald Abramson, Esq. to Hon. Esther Salas re Proposed Order re 25 Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Order)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
September 18, 2014 Filing 26 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #24 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by All Defendants (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER. In response to docket entry 22, the Court requests that the parties provide a joint proposed order on the issues therein by no later than the close of business on Monday, September 22nd. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas. (ps, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
September 5, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motion set for 10/6/2014 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
September 4, 2014 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., FCI, INC., FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, STREAMATES LIMITED, STREAMATES LIMITED DBA STREAMATES, LLC. Responses due by 9/22/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER. The request to postpone the Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/1/2014 before Judge Esther Salas is hereby denied. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 9/4/2014. (ps, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
September 3, 2014 Filing 22 Letter from Ronald Abramson, Esq.. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED ORDER FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2014 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5A before Judge Esther Salas. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/25/14. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. STREAMATES LIMITED DBA STREAMATES, LLC served on 5/14/2014, answer due 9/4/2014. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. RISER APPS LLC served on 5/14/2014, answer due 7/18/2014. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC. served on 5/14/2014, answer due 7/18/2014. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. FLYING CROCODILE, INC. served on 5/14/2014, answer due 7/18/2014. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. FCI, INC. served on 5/14/2014, answer due 6/4/2014. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC. served on 5/14/2014, answer due 7/18/2014. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER-ORDER dismissing as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/25/14. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 19, 2014 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #13 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by STREAMATES LIMITED, STREAMATES LIMITED DBA STREAMATES, LLC, FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, FCI, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/4/14. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 18, 2014 Filing 13 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to FLYING CROCODILE, INC., FCI, INC., ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, STREAMATES LIMITED.. (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 18, 2014 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ps, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2014 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5A before Judge Esther Salas. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/15/2014. (ps, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 4, 2014 Filing 11 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
August 4, 2014 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C..(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 20, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 8/18/2014 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
July 18, 2014 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., FCI, INC., FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, STREAMATES LIMITED. Responses due by 8/4/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 19, 2014 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #8 Order submitted by STREAMATES LIMITED, FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/18/14. (jd, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Consent ORDER that the time for Defts to answer Complaint is extended for an additional 30 days, to 7/18/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/18/14. (jd, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 17, 2014 Filing 7 Letter from Kluger Healey LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 5, 2014 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by STREAMATES LIMITED, FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/18/14. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 4, 2014 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to FLYING CROCODILE, INC., FCI, INC., ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, STREAMATES LIMITED.. (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
June 4, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID A. WARD on behalf of ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., FCI, INC., FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, STREAMATES LIMITED (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., FCI, INC., FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, STREAMATES LIMITED Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Dianne C. Richards* (dr, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
April 25, 2014 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (dr, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
April 25, 2014 Filing 2 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (dr, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]
April 25, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., DOES 1-20, FCI, INC., FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, STREAMATES LIMITED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 5653248) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 AO120 FORM, #2 Certification, #3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only))(dr, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WAG Acquisition LLC v. Flying Crocodile Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flying Crocodile Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Sheffield
Represented By: Steven B Winters
Represented By: Adriane Michelle Scola
Represented By: Phillip G Ray
Represented By: Justin Taylor Quinn
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: David A Ward
Represented By: Brian G Bodine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Streamates Limited
Represented By: Jennifer Sheffield
Represented By: Steven B Winters
Represented By: Adriane Michelle Scola
Represented By: Phillip G Ray
Represented By: Justin Taylor Quinn
Represented By: David A Ward
Represented By: Brian G Bodine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICF Technology Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Sheffield
Represented By: Steven B Winters
Represented By: Adriane Michelle Scola
Represented By: Phillip G Ray
Represented By: Justin Taylor Quinn
Represented By: David A Ward
Represented By: Brian G Bodine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCI Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Sheffield
Represented By: Steven B Winters
Represented By: Adriane Michelle Scola
Represented By: Phillip G Ray
Represented By: Justin Taylor Quinn
Represented By: David A Ward
Represented By: Brian G Bodine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accretive Technology Group Inc
Represented By: Justin Taylor Quinn
Represented By: Jennifer Sheffield
Represented By: Steven B Winters
Represented By: Adriane Michelle Scola
Represented By: Phillip G Ray
Represented By: David A Ward
Represented By: Brian G Bodine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riser Apps LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Sheffield
Represented By: Steven B Winters
Represented By: Adriane Michelle Scola
Represented By: Phillip G Ray
Represented By: Justin Taylor Quinn
Represented By: David A Ward
Represented By: Brian G Bodine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAG Acquisition LLC
Represented By: David G Liston
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Mord Michael Lewis
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Ari Jason Jaffess
Represented By: Alex G Patchen
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Eric A Lindberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?