Turner v. Andrews et al
Plaintiff: Daevon Markell Turner
Defendant: Andrews, Pharmaceutical Provider, Austin and D Bellinger
Case Number: 2:2019cv01293
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 Mail addressed to Daevon Markell Turner returned as Undeliverable (Released 8/28/2019) re #3 Order on IFP and Payments re In Custody Prisoners. (PM)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE Pursuant to Rand-Wyatt re #11 MOTION to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant Austin. (Enns, Geoffrey)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Austin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/25/2019, (Enns, Geoffrey)
September 23, 2019 Attorney Jeffrey Maclean Gregory added for Andrews, D Bellinger; per #8 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant D Bellinger mailed on 8/23/2019 (Smitrovich, Jennifer)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Andrews mailed on 8/23/2019 (Smitrovich, Jennifer)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer M. Smitrovich on behalf of Defendants Andrews, D Bellinger. (Smitrovich, Jennifer)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Austin mailed on 8/23/2019 (Enns, Geoffrey)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Geoffrey A Enns on behalf of Defendant Austin. (Enns, Geoffrey)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Served by 1st Class Mail to Andrews, Doctor at Snohomish County Corrections, Austin, Chief Snohomish County Corrections, and D Bellinger, Charge Nurse at Snohomish County Corrections and Snohomish County Prosecuting Attorney's Office on 8/23/19. (SG)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Daevon Markell Turner.(SG)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS (cc: Plaintiff, WAWD Finance, Snohomish County Corrections Finance Dept) by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (SG)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SG)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Daevon Markell Turner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Andrews et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer M. Smitrovich
Represented By: Jeffrey Maclean Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmaceutical Provider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin
Represented By: Geoffrey A Enns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Bellinger
Represented By: Jennifer M. Smitrovich
Represented By: Jeffrey Maclean Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daevon Markell Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?