Left Coast Ventures Inc v. Bill's Nursery Inc et al
Plaintiff: Left Coast Ventures Inc
Defendant: Bill's Nursery, Stephen Garrison and Bill's Nursery Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01297
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY, filed by Defendants Bill's Nursery Inc, Stephen Garrison, TO RESPONSE to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Jacobowitz, Emanuel)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Left Coast Ventures Inc, to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Oral Argument Requested. (Roller, Jeremy)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/21/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/7/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/15/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Devin (Velvel) Freedman for Bill's Nursery Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Devin (Velvel) Freedman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Bill's Nursery Inc, Stephen Garrison (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5906114 (Jacobowitz, Emanuel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants Bill's Nursery Inc, Stephen Garrison. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 DOH Denial Letters, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/20/2019, (Jacobowitz, Emanuel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bill's Nursery Inc (Jacobowitz, Emanuel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Left Coast Ventures Inc (Roller, Jeremy)
August 19, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/26/2019. (SNP)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
August 19, 2019 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SNP)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number Pending; (Receipt # 0981-5889780) Attorney Emanuel Fraser Jacobowitz added to party Bill's Nursery(pty:dft), Attorney Emanuel Fraser Jacobowitz added to party Stephen Garrison(pty:dft), filed by Stephen Garrison, Bill's Nursery Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Acceptance of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jacobowitz, Emanuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Left Coast Ventures Inc v. Bill's Nursery Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill's Nursery
Represented By: Emanuel Fraser Jacobowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Garrison
Represented By: Emanuel Fraser Jacobowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill's Nursery Inc
Represented By: Emanuel Fraser Jacobowitz
Represented By: Devin (Velvel) Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Left Coast Ventures Inc
Represented By: Jeremy E Roller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?