Ware v. SBC Northwest LLC et al
Plaintiff: Levonnell Ware
Defendant: S.B.C. Northwest L.L.C., Joseph Walker and SBC Northwest LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01300
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting parties' #13 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Responding to Complaint. Defendants shall have until 11/8/2019 to file responsive pleadings, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/15/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/22/2019, Joint Status Report due by 11/29/2019. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Standing Order for Civil Cases (Standing Order) [Dkt. No. 8], the Court HEREBY STRIKES the noting date for the stipulated motion to extend time for responding to complaint [Dkt. No. 13]. Instead, pursuant to Section II.A. 3 of the Standing Order, the opposition to the motion is due twenty-one (21) days after the date on which the motion was filed and the reply is due fourteen (14) days after the opposition is filed. Additionally, for motions where oppositions are not anticipated (i.e., stipulated and/or unopposed motions), the Court will consider said motions upon filing. In the future, the Court expects the parties to comply with the terms of the Standing Order. Authorized by Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein. (RM)
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Peter H Nohle on behalf of Defendants SBC Northwest LLC, Joseph Walker. (Nohle, Peter)
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #13 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time for Responding to Complaint (Nohle, Peter)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 PLEASE DISREGARD. DOCKETED IN ERROR AS A MOTION Proposed MOTION for Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time, filed by Defendant SBC Northwest LLC. Noting Date 10/15/2019, (Nohle, Peter) Modified on 10/16/2019 - see dkt no. #15 for correct pleading (TH).
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time for Responding to Complaint, filed by Defendant SBC Northwest LLC. (Nohle, Peter)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David W Hodges for Plaintiff Levonnell Ware, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David W. Hodges FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Levonnell Ware (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5964571 (Woods, Paul)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Joseph Walker on 9/25/2019 (Assaad, Gabriel)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant SBC Northwest LLC on 9/25/2019 (Assaad, Gabriel)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/1/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/18/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/25/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) SBC Northwest LLC (Main Document), Joseph Walker (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Joseph Walker) (TH)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Joseph Walker by Plaintiff Levonnell Ware (Woods, Paul)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to S.B.C. Northwest LLC. by Plaintiff Levonnell Ware (Woods, Paul)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gabriel A Assaad for Plaintiff Levonnell Ware, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gabriel A. Assaad FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Levonnell Ware (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5892882 (Woods, Paul)
August 20, 2019 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (GT)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5890253) Attorney Paul S. Woods added to party Levonnell Ware(pty:pla), filed by Levonnell Ware. (Attachments: #1 Ware Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ware v. SBC Northwest LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levonnell Ware
Represented By: Paul S. Woods
Represented By: David W Hodges
Represented By: Gabriel A Assaad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.B.C. Northwest L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Walker
Represented By: Peter H Nohle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBC Northwest LLC
Represented By: Peter H Nohle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?