Waithaka v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Plaintiff: Bernard Waithaka
Defendant: Amazon Logistics Inc and Amazon.com Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01320
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re #78 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James Walsh, Jr for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc and Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re #77 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Richard G. Rosenblatt for Defendants Amazon Inc. and Amazon Logistics, Inc. by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re #76 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Meredith Riccio for defendants Amazon Logistics Inc and Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER re #75 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jason D Burns for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc and Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER re #74 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John S Battenfield for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc and Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 2, 2019 Filing 78 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James P. Walsh, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5949764 (Redekopp, Ryan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 77 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard G. Rosenblatt FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5949760 (Redekopp, Ryan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 76 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Meredith E. Riccio FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5949754 (Redekopp, Ryan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 75 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jason D. Burns FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5949749 (Redekopp, Ryan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 74 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John S. Battenfeld FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5949741 (Redekopp, Ryan)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER staying case until the final resolution by the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit of the matter of Waithaka v. Amazon.com, Inc., et al. (1st Cir. No. 19-1848) re: parties' #72 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
September 23, 2019 Filing 72 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Re: Stay Pending Resolution of Appeal by parties (Redekopp, Ryan)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint from 9/3/2019 to 10/3/2019 per parties' #66 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re #68 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Shannon Liss-Riordan for Plaintiff Bernard Waithaka by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re #67 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Adelaide Pagano for Plaintiff Bernard Waithaka by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 5, 2019 Filing 68 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Shannon Liss-Riordan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Bernard Waithaka (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5913938 (Subit, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 67 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Adelaide Pagano FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Bernard Waithaka (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5913841 (Subit, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 66 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Re: Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by parties (Subit, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael C Subit on behalf of Plaintiff Bernard Waithaka. (Subit, Michael)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 10/9/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/25/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/2/2019. (LC)
August 22, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan Drew Redekopp on behalf of Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc. (Redekopp, Ryan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 62 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from District of Massachusetts and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
August 21, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP)
August 21, 2019 Filing 61 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts, Case Number 4:18-cv-40150.
August 20, 2019 Filing 60 Case electronically transferred via cm/ecf to The Western District of Washington. (Castles, Martin) Modified on 8/20/2019 (Jones, Sherry). [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 59 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER AND MEMORANDUM entered granting in part and denying in part #29 Motion to Compel arbitration or, in the alternative, to transfer or stay this litigation. Pursuant to the first-to-file rule, I find that transfer to the Western District of Washington is warranted. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 58 Response by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. to #57 Notice of Supplemental Authorities . (Kaufman, Noah) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 57 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: US Pack Order)(Pagano, Adelaide) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 56 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hearing Transcript - Champion v. Amazon.com, LLC)(Kaufman, Noah) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 54 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on June 18, 2019, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 7/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 53 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order dated June 21, 2019 (Champion v. Amazon.com LLC, et al.), #2 Exhibit Courthouse News Article, #3 Exhibit Law360 Article)(Kaufman, Noah) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 52 Letter/request (non-motion) from Michael E. Kenneally on behalf of Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon Logistics, Inc. . (Kenneally, Michael) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 51 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 6/18/2019 re #29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay filed by Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon Logistics, Inc., Case called, Counsel appear for motion hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules taking under advisement #29 Motion to Compel. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Pagano/Kenneally,Rosenblatt,Kaufman) (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 50 CORRECTED ELECTRONIC NOTICE setting Hearing on Motion #29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay : Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Notice corrects assignment to Courtroom 2- Worcester) (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 49 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay : Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 48 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Richard G. Rosenblatt. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 47 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael E. Kenneally. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 46 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay filed by Bernard Waithaka. (Pagano, Adelaide) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 45 DECLARATION re #44 Reply to Response to Motion by James P. Walsh, Jr. by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bresnahan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to #29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Bresnahan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 43 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #36 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 42 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #40 Motion for Leave to File reply. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Grace Patterson on behalf of Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. (Patterson, Mary) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration by Bernard Waithaka. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sur-Reply)(Pagano, Adelaide) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 39 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard G. Rosenblatt Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7657364 by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Richard G. Rosenblatt)(Bresnahan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 38 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael E. Kenneally Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7657350 by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael E. Kenneally)(Bresnahan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 37 DECLARATION re #36 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Further Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Transfer of James P. Walsh, Jr. by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bresnahan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Further Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Transfer by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Reply))(Bresnahan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 35 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pagano, Adelaide) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #33 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Pagano, Adelaide) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay filed by Bernard Waithaka. (Pagano, Adelaide) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 32 DECLARATION re #30 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay of Peter Nickerson by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Bresnahan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 31 DECLARATION re #30 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Bresnahan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re #29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Bresnahan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc..(Bresnahan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 28 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Amazon Logistics, Inc. answer due 4/2/2019; Amazon.com, Inc. answer due 4/2/2019. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 27 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 2, 2019 to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc..(Kaufman, Noah) Modified on 3/12/2019 (Castles, Martin). [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 26 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER AND MEMORANDUM entered denying #13 Motion to Remand. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 25 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 2/22/2019 re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Bernard Waithaka; said motion argued; Court took the motion UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Kaufman, Lis-Riordan, and Schwartz) (Lovett, Jarrett) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #13 MOTION to Remand : Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2019 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 23 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Kaufman, Noah) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 22 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Proposed Sur-Reply In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Kaufman, Noah) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Bernard Waithaka. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 19 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #13 MOTION to Remand . Reply due by 11/30/2018. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 18 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/30/2018 to File Response/Reply by Bernard Waithaka.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Kaufman, Noah) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah J. Kaufman on behalf of Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. (Kaufman, Noah) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 15 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION to Remand . Response due by 11/2/2018, Reply due by 11/16/2018. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 2, 2018 to Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Dkt. 13) and for leave for Plaintiff to file a reply by November 16, 2018 by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc..(Bresnahan, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/17/2018 (Castles, Martin). [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by Bernard Waithaka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 STATE COURT Record. (Bresnahan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc..(Schwarz, Douglas) Modified on 9/14/2018 (Burgos, Sandra). [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas T. Schwarz on behalf of Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. (Schwarz, Douglas) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Bresnahan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal, of Elizabeth Bresnahan by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bresnahan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal, of Kyle Bowers by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Bresnahan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal, of Peter Nickerson by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Bresnahan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7309929 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form, #5 State Court Notice)(Bresnahan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from mad on 8/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waithaka v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Waithaka
Represented By: Adelaide Pagano
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Logistics Inc
Represented By: Mary Grace Patterson
Represented By: Michael E. Kenneally
Represented By: Douglas T. Schwarz
Represented By: Noah J. Kaufman
Represented By: Richard G Rosenblatt
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Bresnahan
Represented By: Jason D Burns
Represented By: Meredith Riccio
Represented By: John S Battenfield
Represented By: Ryan Drew Redekopp
Represented By: James Walsh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Mary Grace Patterson
Represented By: Richard G Rosenblatt
Represented By: Douglas T. Schwarz
Represented By: Michael E. Kenneally
Represented By: Noah J. Kaufman
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Bresnahan
Represented By: Jason D Burns
Represented By: Meredith Riccio
Represented By: John S Battenfield
Represented By: Ryan Drew Redekopp
Represented By: James Walsh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?