Northwest Administrators Inc v. Triumfo Inc
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Defendant: Triumfo Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01356
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (See plaintiff's #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (SWT)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Triumfo Inc on 9/9/2019 (Reid, Russell)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/4/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/21/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/4/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Triumfo Inc (SNP)
August 28, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SNP)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds against defendant(s) Triumfo Inc (Receipt # 0981-5902504), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators Inc v. Triumfo Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triumfo Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?