Yevseyev v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Vasiliy Yevseyev
Respondent: Bryan S Wilcox, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Warden, Kevin McAleenan, William Barr, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Kevin K McAleenan
Case Number: 2:2019cv01370
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: STIPULATED DISMISSAL OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is dismissed with prejudice and without an award of fees and costs to either party. (AE)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to consent by Petitioner (Dkt. #9 ) and attached consent by respondent(s), case is reassigned to Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida. (AE)
October 8, 2019 Case Reassigned to Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Judge Richard A. Jones no longer assigned to the case. (AE)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Tsuchida ; filed by Petitioner Vasiliy Yevseyev. (Murphy, Gregory)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by parties (Murphy, Gregory)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness, filed by Respondents William Barr, Kevin K McAleenan, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Bryan S Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/1/2019, (Lambert, Michelle)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Respondents William Barr, Kevin K McAleenan, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Bryan S Wilcox. (Lambert, Michelle)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR RETURN AND STATUS REPORT re #1 2241 Petition by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Electronic posting of this Order shall effect service on the United States Attorney and respondent(s). On or before October 4, 2019, respondent(s) shall file a return and status report and note it for November 1, 2019. Petitioner may file a response on or before October 28, 2019. Respondent(s) may file a reply on or before the noting date. (cc: petitioner via USPS)(ST)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (cc: petitioner via USPS)(ST)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: petitioner via USPS) (ST)
August 30, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones and Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (ST)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , filed by Petitioner Vasiliy Yevseyev. (Attachments: #1 FPD Letter) Noting Date 8/29/2019, (Murphy, Gregory)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # 0981-5905401), filed by Vasiliy Yevseyev.(Murphy, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yevseyev v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan S Wilcox
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K McAleenan
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vasiliy Yevseyev
Represented By: Gregory Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?