Ward v. First National Collection Bureau Inc et al
Plaintiff: Lonnie Ward
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive, First National Collection Bureau, Inc., Does 1-10 and First National Collection Bureau Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01385
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Referring Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 JSR deadline NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 11/15/2019, (TW)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 11/15/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/25/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/8/2019, by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez and referred to Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke for all further proceedings. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, for Clerk William M McCool. (TW)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/11/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by First National Collection Bureau Inc (Shafer, Andrew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew David Shafer on behalf of Defendant First National Collection Bureau Inc. (Shafer, Andrew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant First National Collection Bureau Inc mailed on 9/4/2019 (Stasch, Sarah)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) First National Collection Bureau Inc (SNP)
September 3, 2019 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (SNP)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) DOES 1-10, inclusive, First National Collection Bureau, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5907334) Attorney Sarah A Stasch added to party Lonnie Ward(pty:pla), filed by Lonnie Ward. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Stasch, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. First National Collection Bureau Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Collection Bureau, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Collection Bureau Inc
Represented By: Andrew David Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Ward
Represented By: Sarah A Stasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?