Chen v. Cantwell
Plaintiff: Qian Chen
Defendant: Maria Elaine Cantwell
Case Number: 2:2019cv01389
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT BY COURT. Plaintiff Qian Chen's application to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is denied and his complaint is dismissed without prejudice. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying IFP Application and Dismissal Without Prejudice signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
September 10, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour no longer assigned to the case. (MW)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Requesting all Communication and Documents be Submitted via the Telephone, filed by Plaintiff Qian Chen. (MW)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's IFP application (dkt. # 1) is DENIED with LEAVE TO AMEND within 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) Chen contacted on 9/5 by TH (MW).
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Qian Chen. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ST) Modified on 9/3/2019 to change file date to 8/30/19. (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. Cantwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qian Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Elaine Cantwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?