Chen v. Department of Services for the Blind
Plaintiff: Qian Chen
Defendant: Department of Services for the Blind
Case Number: 2:2019cv01392
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Qian Chen, #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Qian Chen. Objections to R&R due by 9/24/2019, Noting Date 9/27/2019. A copy of this R&R has been mailed to plaintiff on 09/10/19. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (Attachments: #1 R&R Proposed Order, #2 R&R Proposed Judgment)(GB)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Requesting all Communication and Documents be Submitted via the Telephone, filed by Plaintiff Qian Chen. (MW)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Qian Chen.(MW)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Qian Chen. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. Department of Services for the Blind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qian Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Services for the Blind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?