Ride the Ducks Seattle LLC v. Ride the Ducks International LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ride the Ducks Seattle, LLC and Ride the Ducks Seattle LLC
Defendant: Ride the Ducks International, LLC, Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation, Jane Doe Herschend, Chris Herschend and Ride the Ducks International LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01408
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:19-cv-01530, by Plaintiff Ride the Ducks Seattle LLC. (Guthrie, Donald)
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Ride the Ducks Seattle LLC.(Buchanan, Patricia)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/6/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/23/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/30/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Donald Guthrie. Filed by Plaintiff Ride the Ducks Seattle LLC. (Guthrie, Donald) Changed firm address on 10/1/2019 (DS).
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 -3 Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation.(Hermsen, Tyler) Modified on 9/23/2019 to add document link to complaint (PM).
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 -3 Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Chris Herschend, Jane Doe Herschend.(Hermsen, Tyler) Modified on 9/23/2019 to add document link to complaint (PM).
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Ride the Ducks Seattle LLC by Ride the Ducks International LLC.(Hermsen, Tyler)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ride the Ducks Seattle LLC (Guthrie, Donald)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation (Hermsen, Tyler)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ride the Ducks International LLC (Hermsen, Tyler)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura. The Honorable J. Richard Creatura is no longer associated with this matter. (KAM)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Removal ; filed by Defendants Chris Herschend, Jane Doe Herschend, Ride the Ducks International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Complaint)(Hermsen, Tyler)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 9/12/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tyler J Hermsen on behalf of Defendants Chris Herschend, Jane Doe Herschend, Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation, Ride the Ducks International LLC. (Hermsen, Tyler)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SNP)
September 5, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/12/2019. (SNP)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
September 5, 2019 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (SNP)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-20421-4; (Receipt # 0981-5910203), filed by Ride the Ducks International, LLC, Chris Herschend, Jane Doe Herschend, Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-F, #3 Complaint)(Hermsen, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ride the Ducks Seattle LLC v. Ride the Ducks International LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ride the Ducks International, LLC
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Represented By: Tyler J Hermsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Represented By: Tyler J Hermsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Herschend
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Represented By: Tyler J Hermsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Herschend
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Represented By: Tyler J Hermsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ride the Ducks International LLC
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Represented By: Tyler J Hermsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ride the Ducks Seattle, LLC
Represented By: Donald Guthrie
Represented By: Nicholas Carlson
Represented By: Duncan K Fobes
Represented By: Patricia Kay Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ride the Ducks Seattle LLC
Represented By: Donald Guthrie
Represented By: Nicholas Carlson
Represented By: Duncan K Fobes
Represented By: Patricia Kay Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?