CMH Homes Inc v. Frueh
Plaintiff: CMH Homes, Inc. and CMH Homes Inc
Defendant: RORICK FRUEH
Case Number: 2:2019cv01415
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Rorick Frueh pursuant to Plaintiff's #7 MOTION for Default. Defendant Rorick Frueh is in default. (VE)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default , filed by Plaintiff CMH Homes Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/7/2019, (Nelson, Tamara)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Rorick Frueh on 9/9/2019, filed by Plaintiff CMH Homes Inc. (Nelson, Tamara)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by CMH Homes Inc (Nelson, Tamara)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 ERRATA re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff CMH Homes Inc (Nelson, Tamara)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Rorick Frueh. (GT)
September 5, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, CMH Homes Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/12/2019. (GT)
September 5, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) RORICK FRUEH (Receipt # 0981-5911507) Attorney Tamara Kristine Nelson added to party CMH Homes, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by CMH Homes, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Tamara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CMH Homes Inc v. Frueh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMH Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Tamara Kristine Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMH Homes Inc
Represented By: Tamara Kristine Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RORICK FRUEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?