Melynchuk v. Air Canda
Plaintiff: Robert Melynchuk
Defendant: Air Canda
Case Number: 2:2019cv01440
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED without prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. Mail) (KERR)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION/REQUEST to Dismiss Defendant Air Canada's Submissions, filed by Plaintiff Robert Melynchuk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) Noted by Clerk for 11/8/2019, (SWT)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 11/12/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. Mail) (KERR)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Air Canda (Lether, Thomas)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint; by Air Canda.(Lether, Thomas)
September 11, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/18/2019. (SNP)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from Whatcom County District Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment (cc: plaintiff via US Mail). (SNP).
September 11, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (SNP)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Whatcom County District Court, case number SC19-191; (Receipt # 0981-5919758), filed by Air Canda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Small Claim, #3 Exhibit B)(Lether, Thomas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melynchuk v. Air Canda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Melynchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Canda
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?