Sea Shepherd Legal v. National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration et al
Plaintiff: Sea Shepherd Legal
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration and National Marine Fisheries Service
Case Number: 2:2019cv01485
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER for relief from discovery deadlines re Parties' #15 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (MW)
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for relief from discovery deadlines by parties (Lambert, Michelle)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration.(Lambert, Michelle)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/14/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/29/2019. (AD)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendants National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. (Lambert, Michelle)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Electronically Issued as to US Attorney for the Western District of Washington (SWT)
September 18, 2019 ** Case has been reassigned to the Honorable James L. Robart, United States District Judge as the Honorable Judge John C. Coughenour, United States District Judge is no longer assigned to the case. Counsel shall now use the following case number on all subsequent pleadings: CV19-1485-JLR ** (PP)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal (Attachments: #1 Summons - U.S. Attorney)(Sommermeyer, Brett)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER: re #2 Praecipe for a Summons. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GT)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration and National Marine Fisheries Service. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(GT)
September 17, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (GT)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Sea Shepherd Legal (Sommermeyer, Brett)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE to attach document re #3 Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal (Attachments: #1 ATTORNEY INFORMATION FOR PLAINTIFF SEA SHEPHERD LEGAL)(Sommermeyer, Brett)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 PRAECIPE by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Sommermeyer, Brett)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:19-cv-463, by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal. (Sommermeyer, Brett)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal. (Sommermeyer, Brett)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Sommermeyer, Brett)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5927010), filed by Sea Shepherd Legal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Sommermeyer, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sea Shepherd Legal v. National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sea Shepherd Legal
Represented By: Catherine E Pruett
Represented By: Brett Wade Sommermeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?