Brown v. Frosh et al
Plaintiff: Jerome Julius Brown, Sr
Defendant: Troy D Berry, R Godwin, CSA Investments LLC, Sharon L Hancock and Brian E Frosh
Case Number: 2:2019cv01503
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT BY COURT. The Report and Recommendation is adopted. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via first class mail
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #4 ; denying Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via first class mail
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address Filed by Plaintiff Jerome Julius Brown, Sr. (TH) (address updated on the docket)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Plaintiff's #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 10/18/2019, Noting Date 10/18/2019. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 R&R Proposed Order, #2 R&R Proposed Judgment) (PM) cc: Plaintiff via first class mail
September 19, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Document(s) contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. Please file a redacted version of the document as soon as practicable. This will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. CC to plaintiff via US Mail. (GT)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. CC to plaintiff via US Mail. (GT)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Michelle L. Peterson, filed by Jerome Julius Brown, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 *SEALED* Exhibit, #4 *SEALED* Exhibit, #5 Proposed Agreement for Individualized Trial and Request for Approval, #6 Proposed Waiver of the Service of Summons)(GT) Modified on 9/19/2019 (GT). Modified on 9/19/2019 to seal unredacted documents

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Frosh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy D Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSA Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon L Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian E Frosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Julius Brown, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?