Ride The Ducks International LLC v. Tracey et al
Plaintiff: Ride The Ducks International, LLC
Defendant: Brian Tracey and Jane Doe Tracey
Case Number: 2:2019cv01530
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #14 Consolidation Order - for Member cases only: Replaced Order reflecting correct case number of C19-1408 MJP. (PM)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF CONSOLDATION directing that Case No. C19-1408 and Case No. C19-1530 are consolidated for all purposes (up to and including trial), and will proceed forward under Case No. C19-1408. The caption will be modified to identify Ride the Ducks, International LLC as the Defendant and Cross-Plaintiff of the consolidated action, and all pleadings from this point forward will be filed under Case No. C19-1408. C19-1530 shall be CLOSED. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) (Main Document 14 replaced on 11/22/2019 with correct case number of C19-1408 MJP) (PM).
October 30, 2019 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE re: #13 Answer to Complaint was improperly signed by Duncan K. Fobes. As such, Mr. Fobes was not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. This deficiency can be corrected by filing a Notice of Appearance on behalf of Mr. Fobes. (PM)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Brian Tracey, Jane Doe Tracey.(Guthrie, Donald)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/9/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/25/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/2/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman for all further proceedings, as related to CV19-1408. Judge Richard A. Jones and Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. (TF)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Hon. Brian A Tsuchida pursuant to local rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (AE)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/30/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AE)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nicholas Carlson on behalf of Defendants Brian Tracey, Jane Doe Tracey. (Carlson, Nicholas)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Donald Guthrie on behalf of Defendants Brian Tracey, Jane Doe Tracey. (Guthrie, Donald)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patricia Kay Buchanan on behalf of Defendants Brian Tracey, Jane Doe Tracey. (Buchanan, Patricia)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ride the Ducks International LLC (Hermsen, Tyler)
September 26, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/3/2019. (SNP)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #3 Summons Issued. (Service of corrected image is attached). (SNP)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Brian Tracey, Jane Doe Tracey (SNP) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/26/2019) (SNP).
September 26, 2019 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (SNP)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Ride The Ducks International, LLC. (Hermsen, Tyler)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5939232), filed by Ride The Ducks International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hermsen, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ride The Ducks International LLC v. Tracey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Tracey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Tracey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ride The Ducks International, LLC
Represented By: Tyler J Hermsen
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?