Moore et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Kathleen F Moore and Charles G Moore
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv01539
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 The Court, upon joint request of the parties, hereby orders the FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline reset to 9/25/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline reset to 10/2/2020, and Joint Status Report due by 10/9/2020.(GT)
June 1, 2020 Filing 38 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Charles G Moore, Kathleen F Moore, TO RESPONSE to #29 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Morrison, James)
May 29, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY, filed by Defendant United States of America, TO RESPONSE to #34 MOTION for Relief under Rule 56(d) (In Event that Motion to Dismiss is Denied) re #29 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Larson, Kari)
May 27, 2020 Filing 36 LETTER from the Court. (GT)
May 26, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Charles G Moore, Kathleen F Moore, to #34 MOTION for Relief under Rule 56(d) (In Event that Motion to Dismiss is Denied) re #29 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morrison, James)
May 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/27/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/3/2020, and Joint Status Report due by 8/10/2020. (GT)
May 11, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Relief under Rule 56(d) (In Event that Motion to Dismiss is Denied) re #29 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . , filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jennifer Y. Golden) Noting Date 5/29/2020, (Golden, Jennifer)
May 11, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY, filed by Defendant United States of America, TO RESPONSE to #29 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ., #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Hearings on Presidents 1963 Tax Message before House Committee on Ways and Means, 88th Cong., 1st Sess., part 1, at 594 (1963))(Larson, Kari)
May 6, 2020 Filing 32 MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/18/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/26/2020, Joint Status Report due by 6/1/2020. (GT)
May 6, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Stricken Status Conference on 6/2/2020. (GT)
March 27, 2020 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' #28 Stipulated Motion for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs. Defendant's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. #26 ) and Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. #29 ) shall be noted for consideration on June 1, 2020. The Clerk is directed to RENOTE Docket Number #26 accordingly. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 27, 2020 Filing 29 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ., filed by Plaintiffs Charles G Moore, Kathleen F Moore. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) Noting Date 6/1/2020, (Morrison, James)
March 26, 2020 Filing 28 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs and Set Extended Schedule, filed by Plaintiffs Charles G Moore, Kathleen F Moore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/26/2020, (Morrison, James)
February 24, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court, on its own motion and in the interest of judicial economy, hereby orders the Status Conference reset from 3/17/2020 to 6/2/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(PP)
February 24, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant United States of America. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/27/2020, (Larson, Kari)
February 20, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' #24 Stipulated Motion for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs and Set Extended Briefing Schedule. Plaintiffs' opposition to the motion to dismiss shall be filed no later than March 27, 2020. The United States' reply brief shall be filed no later than April 27, 2020. The motion to dismiss will be noted for consideration on April 27, 2020. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 18, 2020 Filing 24 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs and Set Extended Briefing Schedule, filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/18/2020, (Golden, Jennifer)
December 16, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting Government's #22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Government's response to the complaint shall be filed on or before February 24, 2020. The status conference scheduled for February 4, 2020, shall be reset to March 17, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Any related deadlines are continued accordingly. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 22, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and to Continue Status Conference, filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/6/2019, (Golden, Jennifer)
November 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Y Golden on behalf of Defendant United States of America. (Golden, Jennifer)
November 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kari Madrene Larson on behalf of Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Larson, Kari)
October 9, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on United States of America, c/o U.S. Attorney for Western District of Washington on 9/27/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Charles G Moore, Kathleen F Moore. (Morrison, James)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Devin Watkins for Charles G Moore and Kathleen F Moore, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sam Kazman for Charles G Moore and Kathleen F Moore, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David B Rivkin, Jr for Charles G Moore and Kathleen F Moore, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew M Grossman for Charles G Moore and Kathleen F Moore, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Katherine L McKnight for Charles G Moore and Kathleen F Moore, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeffrey H Paravano for Charles G Moore and Kathleen F Moore, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nicholas C Mowbray for Charles G Moore and Kathleen F Moore, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Devin Watkins FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Charles G Moore, Kathleen F Moore (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5946710 (Morrison, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sam Kazman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Charles G Moore, Kathleen F Moore (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5946706 (Morrison, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David B. Rivkin, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Charles G Moore, Kathleen F Moore (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5946699 (Morrison, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew M. Grossman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Charles G Moore, Kathleen F Moore (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5946694 (Morrison, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Katherine L. McKnight FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Charles G Moore, Kathleen F Moore (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5946689 (Morrison, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeffrey H. Paravano FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Charles G Moore, Kathleen F Moore (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5946678 (Morrison, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nicholas C. Mowbray FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Charles G Moore, Kathleen F Moore (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5946639 (Morrison, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A STATUS CONFERENCE is set for 2/4/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States of America. (GT)
September 27, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (GT)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Refund of Federal Income Tax and Interest against defendant(s) United States of America (Receipt # 0981-5941841), filed by Charles G Moore, Kathleen F Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Morrison, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen F Moore
Represented By: James Raymond Morrison
Represented By: David B Rivkin, Jr
Represented By: Katherine L McKnight
Represented By: Nicholas C Mowbray
Represented By: Jeffrey H Paravano
Represented By: Devin Watkins
Represented By: Sam Kazman
Represented By: Andrew M Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles G Moore
Represented By: James Raymond Morrison
Represented By: David B Rivkin, Jr
Represented By: Katherine L McKnight
Represented By: Nicholas C Mowbray
Represented By: Jeffrey H Paravano
Represented By: Devin Watkins
Represented By: Sam Kazman
Represented By: Andrew M Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jennifer Y Golden
Represented By: Kari Madrene Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?