Galaviz v. Federal Bureau of Investigations
Plaintiff: Ryan Anthony Galaviz
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigations
Case Number: 2:2019cv01611
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS of King County District Court by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fogg, Christina)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Christina Fogg filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigations re #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fogg, Christina)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigations. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/8/2019, (Fogg, Christina)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County District Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment (cc: plaintiff via US Mail). (SNP)
October 9, 2019 Judge James L. Robart added. (SNP)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigations. (Fogg, Christina)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from WA District & Municipal - King County District, case number 195-01385 SC; (), filed by Federal Bureau of Investigations. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Small Claim)(Fogg, Christina) (No Fee Required).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galaviz v. Federal Bureau of Investigations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigations
Represented By: Christina Fogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Anthony Galaviz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?