King et al v. Timber Ridge Trading & Manufacturing Company
Plaintiff: Maryann E Voisinet and David A King
Defendant: Timber Ridge Trading & Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01617
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE: Plaintiff Maryann E Voisinet has registered to receive electronic service. The party WILL NOT be e-filing. (PS)
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs David A King, Maryann E Voisinet. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit Copy of emails related to standing order, #3 Proposed Order Proposed order permitting amendment of the complaint, #4 Amended Complaint Second amended complaint)(King, David)
December 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE: Plaintiff David A King has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS)
December 2, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff David A King re #11 Joint Status Report Order. (MW)
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Timber Ridge Trading & Manufacturing Company, filed by David A King, Maryann E Voisinet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MW)
December 2, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs David A King, Maryann E Voisinet, to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for lack of personal jurisdiction. (MW)
November 25, 2019 ***Deadlines terminated. The Court notifies the parties that the deadlines contained in the #11 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT are suspended pending the Court's ruling on Defendant's #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for lack of personal jurisdiction. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (VE)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Gregory Lanzo filed by Defendant Timber Ridge Trading & Manufacturing Company re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for lack of personal jurisdiction (Wraith, Steven)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for lack of personal jurisdiction, filed by Defendant Timber Ridge Trading & Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/20/2019, (Wraith, Steven)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Timber Ridge Trading & Manufacturing Company (Wraith, Steven)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/5/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/12/2019, Joint Status Report due by 12/19/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (VE)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christopher J Skinner for Timber Ridge Trading & Manufacturing Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher J. Skinner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Timber Ridge Trading & Manufacturing Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6020032 (Wraith, Steven)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steven George Wraith on behalf of Defendant Timber Ridge Trading & Manufacturing Company. (Wraith, Steven)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Timber Ridge Trading & Manufacturing Company on 11/2/2019 (MW)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Timber Ridge Trading & Manufacturing Company, filed by David A King.(MW)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in Eastern District of North Carolina, case number in other court 5:19-cv-13-FL ; filed by Plaintiff David A King. (TH)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (VE)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. ** Reminder ** Documents omittedSee attached letter for more information and instructions. cc to plaintiffs via US Mail. (GT)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. cc to plaintiff via US Mail. (GT)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Timber Ridge Trading & Manufacturing Company with JURY DEMAND (Summons issued) (Receipt # SEA098171), filed by David A King, Maryann E Voisinet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter From Filer)(GT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. Timber Ridge Trading & Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann E Voisinet
Represented By: Maryann E Voisinet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A King
Represented By: David A King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timber Ridge Trading & Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Steven George Wraith
Represented By: Christopher J Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?