Shattenkirk v. Alaska Airlines Inc
Plaintiff: Madeleine F Shattenkirk
Defendant: Alaska Airlines Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01656
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING #21 MOTION to Transfer Case or Stay and #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ; Noting Date 2/7/2020. (KERR)
December 9, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/3/2020, (Jenkins, Gayle)
December 9, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Transfer Case or Stay, filed by Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/3/2020, (Jenkins, Gayle)
December 9, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Alaska Air Group, Inc. for Alaska Airlines Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Alaska Airlines Inc (Jenkins, Gayle)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Rosemary M Rivas for Plaintiff Madeleine F Shattenkirk, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 4, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rosemary M. Rivas FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Madeleine F Shattenkirk (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6035191 (Stephens, Kim)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 12/19/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (Main Document 17 replaced on 11/21/2019) (KERR).
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The deadline for the defendant to respond to the complaint is extended from November 8, 2019 to December 9, 2019. If defendant elects to file a motion to dismiss or similar motion, plaintiff's opposition will be due on January 13, 2020, and defendant's reply will be due on February 3, 2020. (KERR)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lazaro Fernandez for Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gayle I Jenkins for Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lazaro Fernandez, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6004165 (Francis, Rebecca)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gayle I. Jenkins FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6004164 (Francis, Rebecca)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc.'s Time to Respond to Complaint by parties (Francis, Rebecca)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rebecca J Francis on behalf of Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc. (Francis, Rebecca)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Melissa Emert for Plaintiff Madeleine F Shattenkirk, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel C Hedlund for Plaintiff Madeleine F Shattenkirk, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Melissa R. Emert FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Madeleine F Shattenkirk (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5984670 (Stephens, Kim)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel C. Hedlund FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Madeleine F Shattenkirk (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5984661 (Stephens, Kim)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Alaska Airlines, Inc. on 10/18/2019, filed by Plaintiff Madeleine F Shattenkirk. (Stephens, Kim)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Marc Lawrence Godino for plaintiff Madeleine F Shattenkirk, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Alaska Airlines Inc. (GT)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Marc L. Godino FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Madeleine F Shattenkirk (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5968893 (Stephens, Kim)
October 17, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Alaska Airlines Inc with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5967671), filed by Madeleine F Shattenkirk. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Stephens, Kim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shattenkirk v. Alaska Airlines Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeleine F Shattenkirk
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Godino
Represented By: Rebecca Luise Solomon
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: Melissa Emert
Represented By: Rosemary M Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Airlines Inc
Represented By: Rebecca J Francis
Represented By: Gayle I Jenkins
Represented By: Lazaro Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?