Caveman Foods LLC v. Cave Man Kitchens Inc et al
Plaintiff: Caveman Foods, LLC and Caveman Foods LLC
Defendant: Cave Man Kitchens, Inc. and Cave Man Kitchens Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01667
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Michael Adams filed by Plaintiff Caveman Foods LLC re #10 MOTION to Remand and for Attorneys' Fees (Breaux, Diana)
December 13, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Caveman Foods LLC, TO RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Remand and for Attorneys' Fees (Breaux, Diana)
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE, by Defendants Cave Man Kitchens Inc, Cave Man Kitchens Inc, to #10 MOTION to Remand and for Attorneys' Fees. Oral Argument Requested. (Mann, Philip)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Caveman Foods LLC (Breaux, Diana)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Michael D. Adams In Support Of Motion for Remand and for Attorneys' Fees filed by Plaintiff Caveman Foods LLC re #10 MOTION to Remand and for Attorneys' Fees (Breaux, Diana)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand and for Attorneys' Fees, filed by Plaintiff Caveman Foods LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/13/2019, (Breaux, Diana)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Pursuant to parties' #6 Stipulation, Marjorie A. Walter, Michael E. Kipling, and the firm of Walter Kipling, PLLC are granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record for Caveman Foods, LLC. Parties' #6 Stipulation is treated as a notice of appearance by Diana S. Breaux. Caveman Foods, LLC must file in each case (C19-1667 TSZ, C19-1668 TSZ and C18-1274 TSZ), within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Minute Order, a corporate disclosure statement identifying all members of the limited liability company, as well as their places of residence. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Minute Order, counsel shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Repor t indicating whether these three actions should be consolidated.(SWT) (Attorney Diana S Breaux for Caveman Foods LLC added. Attorneys Michael E Kipling and Marjorie Alison Walter terminated.)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD filed by Defendants Cave Man Kitchens Inc, Cave Man Kitchens Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mann, Philip)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cave Man Kitchens Inc(a dissolved Washington corporation), Cave Man Kitchens Inc(a Washington corporation) (Mann, Philip)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by parties (Breaux, Diana)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:18-cv-1274; 2:19-cv-1668, by Defendants Cave Man Kitchens Inc, Cave Man Kitchens Inc. (Mann, Philip)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. ad hoc to Michael D Adams, Seth M Jessee and Meredith L Williams. (GT)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 10/23/2019. (GT)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
October 18, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (GT)
October 18, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiffs and Defendants must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/25/2019. (GT)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-24303-1 KNT; (Receipt # 0981-5969271) Attorney Philip P Mann added to party Cave Man Kitchens, Inc.(pty:dft), filed by Cave Man Kitchens, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mann, Philip) Modified on 10/18/2019 (GT). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2019: #3 State Court Complaint) (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caveman Foods LLC v. Cave Man Kitchens Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caveman Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caveman Foods LLC
Represented By: Diana S Breaux
Represented By: Marjorie Alison Walter
Represented By: Michael E Kipling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cave Man Kitchens, Inc.
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cave Man Kitchens Inc
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?