Pierson v. Alaska USA Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Emily Pierson
Defendant: Alaska USA Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 2:2019cv01685
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Emily Pierson, TO RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Remand (Martin, David)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Daniel P. Crowner filed by Defendant Alaska USA Federal Credit Union re #11 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Crowner, Daniel)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE, by Defendant Alaska USA Federal Credit Union, to #11 MOTION to Remand . (Crowner, Daniel)
November 22, 2019 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES: The Court acknowledges it has received and reviewed the parties' #13 Joint Status Report, but finds good cause to defer entry of a case schedule pending the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's 25 MOTION to Remand. (VE)
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 7. (Griffin, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of David C. Martin filed by Plaintiff Emily Pierson re #11 MOTION to Remand (Martin, David)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Emily Pierson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/13/2019, (Martin, David)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Alaska USA Federal Credit Union (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Griffin, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Emily Pierson (Martin, David)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/6/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/13/2019, Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
October 22, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SNP)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint; by Alaska USA Federal Credit Union.(Crowner, Daniel)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Lynn Krupa re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Alaska USA Federal Credit Union (Crowner, Daniel)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Alaska USA Federal Credit Union (Crowner, Daniel)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Michael A. Griffin re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Alaska USA Federal Credit Union (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Crowner, Daniel)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-22260-3-SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5971549), filed by Alaska USA Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crowner, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierson v. Alaska USA Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Pierson
Represented By: David C Martin
Represented By: Margaret Pak Enslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska USA Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Daniel P Crowner
Represented By: Michael Anthony Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?