Solheim et al v. Pacific Union Financial LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, successor by merger to Pacific Union Financial, LLC, Tyler and Miriam Solheim, Tyler Solheim and Miriam Solheim
Defendant: Pacific Union Financial LLC, Paul St Marie and Christopher T Watkins
Case Number: 2:2019cv01712
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Pacific Union Financial LLC (Coughlin, Laura)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, successor by merger to Pacific Union Financial, LLC, Other Affiliate KKR Wand Investors Corporation, a Cayman Islands corporation for Pacific Union Financial LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pacific Union Financial LLC (Coughlin, Laura)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/30/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/16/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/30/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Joshua S. Schaer as counsel for Defendant Pacific Union Financial, LLC - filed in State Court Action re #3 Notice to Filer ; filed by Defendant Pacific Union Financial LLC. (Coughlin, Laura)
October 24, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Pacific Union Financial LLC must file aCorporate Disclosure Statement by 10/31/2019. (GT)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GT)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
October 24, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (GT)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-27208-4 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5978951), filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, successor by merger to Pacific Union Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 State Court Records)(Coughlin, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solheim et al v. Pacific Union Financial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, successor by merger to Pacific Union Financial, LLC
Represented By: Laura Nichole Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler and Miriam Solheim
Represented By: Melissa A Huelsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Solheim
Represented By: Melissa A Huelsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Solheim
Represented By: Melissa A Huelsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Union Financial LLC
Represented By: Laura Nichole Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul St Marie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher T Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?