Lehman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Bryan Lehman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv01731
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Saul, Barr and Moran on 12/20/2019, filed by Plaintiff Bryan Lehman. (Grad, Harvey)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Summons Andrew Saul Commr SSA, #2 Summons Brian T Moran USA for WDWA)(PM)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #4 Complaint by Plaintiff Bryan Lehman (Attachments: #1 Summons Wm. Barr US Attorney Gen., #2 Summons Andrew Saul Commr SSA, #3 Summons Brian T Moran USA for WDWA)(Grad, Harvey)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 BLANK SUMMONS FORM LETTER (Attachments: #1 Blank Summons Form) (TH)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Bryan Lehman. (TH)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (TH)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura. The Honorable J. Richard Creatura is no longer associated with this matter. (KAM)
October 28, 2019 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (SNP)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Bryan Lehman. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grad, Harvey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lehman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Lehman
Represented By: Harvey S. Grad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?