City of Seattle v. McKesson Corporation et al
Plaintiff: City of Seattle
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Walgreen Co and Cardinal Health Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01741
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 TRANSFERRED CASE opened in the Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-46086 on 11/22/2019. (PM)
November 20, 2019 Case sent to the Northern District of Ohio by electronic case transfer. (PM)
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 MDL No. 2804 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-120); In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation; Northern District of Ohio; assigned to Judge Dan A. Polster. (PM)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cardinal Health Inc (Power, Vanessa)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' #10 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is hereby EXTENDED to 60 days after the Court's decision on Plaintiff's potential motion to remand or the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation's decision on a conditional transfer, whichever is later. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 4, 2019 Attorney Jenna M Poligo for Cardinal Health Inc added; per #8 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/4/2019, (Devlin, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc (Powell, Emily)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Vanessa Soriano Power on behalf of Defendant Cardinal Health Inc. (Power, Vanessa)
November 1, 2019 Attorneys Patricia A Eakes and Emily Dodds Powell for Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc added; per #7 Verification of State Court Records. (SWT)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS [Supplemental] by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Mangan, Brendan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Devlin, John)
October 29, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/5/2019. (SNP)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SNP)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
October 29, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (SNP)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mangan, Brendan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by McKesson Corporation (Mangan, Brendan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-25768-7 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5985257) Attorney Brendan Thomas Mangan added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft), filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mangan, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Seattle v. McKesson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Seattle
Represented By: Peter Samuel Holmes
Represented By: Emilee N Sisco
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Mangan
Represented By: Mark N Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: Pilar C French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc
Represented By: Patricia A Eakes
Represented By: Emily Dodds Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Patricia A Eakes
Represented By: Emily Dodds Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Represented By: Jenna M Poligo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?