King v. Juvenile Court Florida et al
Plaintiff: Nikie M King
Defendant: Department of Children and Families, Commission of the State of Florida, United States District Court Southern District and Juvenile Court Florida
Case Number: 2:2019cv01769
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 Mail addressed to Nikie M King returned as Undeliverable re #6 Order to Show Cause, (TH)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 Mail addressed to Nikie M King returned as Undeliverable re Notice to Filer, (TH)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The matter is DISMISSED for improper venue. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)(cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 Mail addressed to Nikie M King returned as Undeliverable re Notice to Filer, #4 IFP Deficiency Letter, (TH)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why the above-captioned matter should not be dismissed for improper venue under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Plaintiff shall file her response within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)(cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
November 4, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Application: The juvenile court records contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. Please file a redacted version of the document as soon as practicable. This will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. cc plaintiff via USPS (KB)
October 31, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re #2 Sealed Document / Attachment to IFP and photo of children. Document(s) contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. Please file a redacted version of the document as soon as practicable. This will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - Original Signature is missing from the document(s). Please sign as appropriate.- Please sign the enclosed IFP application and Complaint with your original signature and return to the clerk's office. Filer has until 12/2/2019 to correct (CDA)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:19-cv-01543-JCC, by Plaintiff Nikie M King. (CDA)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT Attachment to IFP by Plaintiff Nikie M King (Attachments: #1 Photo)(sealed administratively due to personal identifiers)(CDA)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Nikie M King. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Complaint, #2 Order from District of Florida, SEALED DOCUMENT #3 Court documents, #4 Illegible document labeled IFP, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Email transmittal)(CDA) Modified on 11/4/2019 to seal document 1-3: Document contains personal identifiers. Document sealed pursuant to Local Rule LCR 5.2. (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Juvenile Court Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Children and Families
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commission of the State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States District Court Southern District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juvenile Court Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikie M King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?