Tutschek v. Schinazi et al
Plaintiff: Martin Tutschek
Defendant: Gary Wilcox, Michael Brauser, Barry Honig, Brian Keller, Jeffrey Meckler, Jane Hsiao, John O'Rourke, Raymond F Schinazi, John Stetson, Phillip Frost, Todd Brady, Steve Rubin, David S Block and Elliot Mitchell Maza
Nominal Defendant: Cocrystal Pharma, Inc. and Cocrystal Pharma Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01775
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Parties' #15 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Acceptance of Service of Process and Stay of Proceedings: Except as noted below, all proceedings, including any motion practice, obligation to respond to the Complaint and any amended complaint, and all discovery and disclosure obligations or deadlines under the applicable local and federal rules or previously-issued Orders of this Court in the Action are hereby stayed until further order of the Court. All pending deadlines, hearings, or conferences are vacated until after the stay is lifted. Within fourteen (14) days after the Securities Class Action is resolved, or a motion to dismiss the Securities Class Action is denied, or by 7/31/2020, whichever occurs earliest, the parties to this Action shall file a Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
December 11, 2019 Attorney Sean C Knowles, Joseph E. Bringman for David S Block, Todd Brady, Cocrystal Pharma Inc, Jane Hsiao, Jeffrey Meckler, Steve Rubin, Raymond F Schinazi, and Gary Wilcox added; per #13 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Acceptance of Service of Process and Stay of Proceedings, filed by Defendants David S Block, Todd Brady, Jane Hsiao, Jeffrey Meckler, Steve Rubin, Raymond F Schinazi, Gary Wilcox, Nominal Defendant Cocrystal Pharma Inc. Noting Date 12/11/2019, (Berenstain, Ronald)
December 11, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cocrystal Pharma Inc (Berenstain, Ronald)
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ronald L Berenstain on behalf of Defendants David S Block, Todd Brady, Jane Hsiao, Jeffrey Meckler, Steve Rubin, Raymond F Schinazi, Gary Wilcox, Nominal Defendant Cocrystal Pharma Inc. (Berenstain, Ronald)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Elliot Mitchell Maza mailed on 11/13/2019 (Katz, David)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Brian Keller on 11/20/2019, filed by Plaintiff Martin Tutschek. (Katz, David)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant John O'Rourke mailed on 11/12/2019 (Katz, David)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Michael H. Brauser on 11/19/2019, filed by Plaintiff Martin Tutschek. (Katz, David)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/21/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/6/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/21/2020, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Brian Keller (Main Document), and Michael Brauser (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Michael H. Brauser) (TH)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Martin Tutschek (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Katz, David)
November 6, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly as related to C19-80TSZ. Judge Robert S. Lasnik no longer assigned to the case. (KERR)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David C Katz for Martin Tutschek, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David C. Katz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Martin Tutschek (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5996551 (Townsend, Roger)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 19-00080, by Plaintiff Martin Tutschek. (Townsend, Roger)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 11/12/2019. (GT)
November 4, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT)
November 4, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Cocrystal Pharma Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/12/2019. (GT)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified Stockholder Derivative) against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5991325), filed by Martin Tutschek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Townsend, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tutschek v. Schinazi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Wilcox
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Honig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Meckler
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Hsiao
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond F Schinazi
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stetson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Brady
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Rubin
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S Block
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Mitchell Maza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Cocrystal Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Cocrystal Pharma Inc
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Tutschek
Represented By: Roger M Townsend
Represented By: David C Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?