LaGroue v. State of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Robert Edward LaGroue
Defendant: State of Washington, Office of the Prosecuting Attorney, King County, Public Defenders Office and Superior Court of the State of Washington
Case Number: 2:2019cv01800
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/24/2020, (Dibble, Candie)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Candie M Dibble on behalf of Defendant State of Washington. (Dibble, Candie)
December 27, 2019 Noting Date Reset re Defendant Public Defender's Office's #10 MOTION to Dismiss Party King County Department of Public Defense : Noting Date 1/17/2020, per LCR 7(d)(3) and per direction of chambers. (PM) cc: NEF sent to plaintiff via first class mail
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Party King County Department of Public Defense, filed by Defendant Public Defenders Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/10/2020, (Baker, La Rond)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney La Rond Baker on behalf of Defendant Public Defenders Office. (Baker, La Rond)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on State of Washington c/o Attorney General on 12/3/2019, filed by Plaintiff Robert Edward LaGroue. (PM)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Office of the Prosecuting Attorney on 12/3/2019, filed by Plaintiff Robert Edward LaGroue. (PM)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Superior Court of the State of Washington on 12/3/2019, filed by Plaintiff Robert Edward LaGroue. (PM)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Public Defenders Office on 12/3/2019, filed by Plaintiff Robert Edward LaGroue. (PM)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Mail addressed to Robert Edward LaGroue returned as Undeliverable re #3 Letter (TH)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (CDA)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Summons(es) issued) (Receipt # SEA098577), filed by Robert Edward Lagroue. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover letter)(CDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaGroue v. State of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Represented By: Candie M Dibble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Prosecuting Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Represented By: Candie M Dibble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Defenders Office
Represented By: La Rond Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of the State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Edward LaGroue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?