Westmark Emerald Pointe LLC v. City of Burien
Plaintiff: Westmark Emerald Pointe, LLC and Westmark Emerald Pointe LLC
Defendant: City of Burien
Case Number: 2:2019cv01821
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Westmark Emerald Pointe LLC, TO RESPONSE to #16 MOTION Leave to Amend and Remand State Claims (Klinge, Charles)
December 16, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE, by Defendant City of Burien, to #16 MOTION Leave to Amend and Remand State Claims . (Plant, Quinn)
December 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Quinn N Plant on behalf of Defendant City of Burien. (Plant, Quinn)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re: parties' #13 Stipulated Motion to Modify Dates. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/18/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/17/2020, Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 1/17/2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION Leave to Amend and Remand State Claims , filed by Plaintiff Westmark Emerald Pointe LLC. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/20/2019, (Klinge, Charles)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action ; filed by Plaintiff Westmark Emerald Pointe LLC. (Klinge, Charles)
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Hillary Evans Graber on behalf of Defendant City of Burien. (Graber, Hillary)
December 4, 2019 Clerk's note: Clerk received phone call from counsel for City of Burien. Clerk advised that a Notice of Appearance is necessary for Attorney Hillary Evans Graber to be added to the court docket, per LCR 83.2. (PM)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION AND ORDER MODIFYING DATES, filed by Defendant City of Burien. (Harper, Kenneth)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Kim Adams Pratt for Defendant City of Burien. (Graber, Hillary)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by City of Burien.(Harper, Kenneth)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action ; filed by Plaintiff Westmark Emerald Pointe LLC. (Klinge, Charles)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - Corporate Parent or Affiliate indicated by filer, but not added in CM/ECF. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Westmark Emerald Pointe LLC (Klinge, Charles)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/26/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/11/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/18/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
November 13, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/20/2019. (SNP)
November 12, 2019 Attorney Michael R Kenyon added for City of Burien per #7 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kim Adams Pratt on behalf of Defendant City of Burien. (Pratt, Kim)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) City of Burien with JURY DEMAND, filed by Westmark Emerald Pointe LLC.(Klinge, Charles)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Westmark Emerald Pointe LLC (Klinge, Charles)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SNP)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
November 12, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant City of Burien of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court (Harper, Kenneth)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-27832-3-KNT; (Receipt # 0981-6003074) Attorney Kenneth W Harper added to party City of Burien(pty:dft), filed by City of Burien. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Other Documents filed in State court proceeding, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harper, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westmark Emerald Pointe LLC v. City of Burien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Burien
Represented By: Kim Adams Pratt
Represented By: Kenneth W Harper
Represented By: Michael R Kenyon
Represented By: Quinn N Plant
Represented By: Hillary Evans Graber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westmark Emerald Pointe, LLC
Represented By: Richard M Stephens
Represented By: Charles A Klinge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westmark Emerald Pointe LLC
Represented By: Richard M Stephens
Represented By: Charles A Klinge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?