Rielly et al v. Samson Tug & Barge Company Inc
Plaintiff: Ronald Rielly and Pamela Rielly
Defendant: Samson Tug & Barge Company, Inc. and Samson Tug & Barge Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01827
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/23/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/9/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/16/2020, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas George Waller on behalf of Defendant Samson Tug & Barge Company Inc. (Waller, Thomas)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Meliha Jusupovic on behalf of Defendant Samson Tug & Barge Company Inc. (Jusupovic, Meliha)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint; by Samson Tug & Barge Company Inc.(Krisher, Mark)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Samson Tug & Barge Company Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Waller, Thomas)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. ad hoc to attorney Meliha Jusupovic (GT)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Patrick Trudell on behalf of Plaintiffs Pamela Rielly, Ronald Rielly. (Trudell, Patrick)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GT)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
November 13, 2019 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (GT)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Samson Tug & Barge Company, Inc. (Krisher, Mark)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Mark A. Krisher re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Samson Tug & Barge Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Krisher, Mark)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-28461-7 KNT; (Receipt # 0981-6005909), filed by Samson Tug & Barge Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1)(Krisher, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rielly et al v. Samson Tug & Barge Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Rielly
Represented By: Robert Scott Bowen
Represented By: Patrick Trudell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Rielly
Represented By: Robert Scott Bowen
Represented By: Patrick Trudell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samson Tug & Barge Company, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas George Waller
Represented By: Mark A. Krisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samson Tug & Barge Company Inc
Represented By: Mark A. Krisher
Represented By: Thomas George Waller
Represented By: Meliha Jusupovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?