Hergert et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Lynn Hergert and Scott Hergert
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01898
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 TRANSFERRED CASE opened in the Northern District of California as case 3:20-cv-00017 on 1/2/2020. (PM)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 MDL 2741 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-175); In re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation; Northern District of California; assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. (PM)
December 27, 2019 Case sent to the Northern District of California by electronic case. (PM)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/24/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/10/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/17/2020, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Monsanto Company mailed on 11/25/2019 (Weymuller, Sims)
November 25, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (GT)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against defendant(s) Monsanto Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6022210) Attorney Sims G Weymuller added to party Lynn Hergert(pty:pla), Attorney Sims G Weymuller added to party Scott Hergert(pty:pla), filed by Lynn Hergert, Scott Hergert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weymuller, Sims)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hergert et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Hergert
Represented By: Sims G Weymuller
Represented By: Elizabeth Jean McLafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hergert
Represented By: Sims G Weymuller
Represented By: Elizabeth Jean McLafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?