Rawlins v. Marlow et al
Plaintiff: Keith Rawlins
Defendant: Christian Anderson, Mike Systsoma, Christopher Loveless, Sherry Kness, Don Marlow, Mohon and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2019cv01905
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by John E Justice on behalf of Defendants Christian Anderson, Sherry Kness, Christopher Loveless, Don Marlow, Mohon, Mike Systsoma. **PRINT ALL**(Keith Rawlins, Prisoner ID: 418116)(Justice, John)
December 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erik Pedersen on behalf of Defendants Christian Anderson, Sherry Kness, Christopher Loveless, Don Marlow, Mohon, Mike Systsoma. **PRINT ALL**(Keith Rawlins, Prisoner ID: 418116)(Pedersen, Erik)
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Mohon mailed on 12/5/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Keith Rawlins, Prisoner ID: 418116)(Pedersen, Erik)
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Sherry Kness mailed on 12/5/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Keith Rawlins, Prisoner ID: 418116)(Pedersen, Erik)
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Mike Systsoma mailed on 12/5/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Keith Rawlins, Prisoner ID: 418116)(Pedersen, Erik)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Christopher Loveless mailed on 12/5/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Keith Rawlins, Prisoner ID: 418116)(Pedersen, Erik)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Christian Anderson mailed on 12/5/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Keith Rawlins, Prisoner ID: 418116)(Pedersen, Erik)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Don Marlow mailed on 12/5/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Keith Rawlins, Prisoner ID: 418116)(Pedersen, Erik)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Served by 1st Class Mail to Don Marlow; Christian Anderson; Christopher Loveless; Sherry Kness; Mohon; Mike Systsoma on 12/5/2019. (cc: Skagit County Prosecutor's Office)**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Rawlins, Prisoner ID: 4181166)(ST)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Keith Rawlins against defendant(s) Christian Anderson, John Doe, Sherry Kness, Christopher Loveless, Don Marlow, Mohon, Mike Systsoma with JURY DEMAND **11 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Keith Rawlins, Prisoner ID: 4181166)(ST)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance)**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Rawlins, Prisoner ID: 4181166)(ST)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Keith Rawlins.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Keith Rawlins, Prisoner ID: 4181166)(AQ)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Plaintiff filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis on November 18, 2019 (Dkt. 39) that was docketed in Marlow v. Kwant, C19-466-TSZ. Plaintiff indicates in a letter, Dkt. 42, that he intended this IFP application to be submitted with the complaint he filed in this case, Rawlins v.Marlow, C19-1905-RSM-BAT. The Court accordingly directs the IFP application, Dkt. 39, in C19-466 be filed in this case. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Keith Rawlins, Prisoner ID: 4181166)(AQ)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $400.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 12/23/2019 to correct (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Rawlins, Prisoner ID: 4181166)(SG)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Plaintiff Keith Rawlins (NO FILING FEE/NO IFP)**11 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Keith Rawlins, Prisoner ID: 4181166)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rawlins v. Marlow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Anderson
Represented By: John E Justice
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Systsoma
Represented By: John E Justice
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Loveless
Represented By: John E Justice
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Kness
Represented By: John E Justice
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Marlow
Represented By: John E Justice
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohon
Represented By: John E Justice
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Rawlins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?