Maier v. Washington Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Michael John Maier and Michael-John Frederick Maier
Defendant: Washington Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2019cv01915
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Referring Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Application filed by Michael-John Frederick Maier. Objections to R&R due by 1/31/2020, Noting Date 2/7/2020. A copy of this R&R has been mailed to plaintiff on 01/10/20. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (Attachments: #1 R&R Proposed Order, #2 R&R Proposed Judgment)(GB)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 12/26/2019 to correct. (cc: plaintiff via USPS) (ST)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Michael John Maier. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maier v. Washington Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael John Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael-John Frederick Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?