Nemykina v. Old Navy LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anna Nemykina
Defendant: Old Navy Holdings, LLC, GPS Services, Inc., Old Navy, LLC, The Gap, Inc., Old Navy (Apparel), LLC, Does 1-20, Old Navy LLC, GPS Services Inc, Old Navy Holdings LLC, Old Navy (Apparel) LLC and The Gap Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01958
Filed: December 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Anna Nemykina.(Hattis, Daniel)
December 16, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant The Gap Inc mailed on 12/13/2019 (Corrington, Che)
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant GPS Services Inc mailed on 12/13/2019 (Corrington, Che)
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Old Navy Holdings LLC mailed on 12/13/2019 (Corrington, Che)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Old Navy (Apparel) LLC mailed on 12/13/2019 (Corrington, Che)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Old Navy LLC mailed on 12/13/2019 (Corrington, Che)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants GPS Services Inc, Old Navy (Apparel) LLC, Old Navy Holdings LLC, Old Navy LLC, The Gap Inc. (TF)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Che Z Corrington on behalf of Plaintiff Anna Nemykina. (Corrington, Che)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Paul Karl Lukacs for Plaintiff Anna Nemykina, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SNP)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Paul Karl Lukacs FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Anna Nemykina (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6034942 (Hattis, Daniel)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Anna Nemykina (Hattis, Daniel)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SNP)
December 3, 2019 Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (SNP)
December 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6030455) Attorney Daniel M Hattis added to party Anna Nemykina(pty:pla), filed by Anna Nemykina. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hattis, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nemykina v. Old Navy LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Navy Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPS Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Navy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gap, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Navy (Apparel), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Navy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPS Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Navy Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Navy (Apparel) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gap Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Nemykina
Represented By: Daniel M Hattis
Represented By: Che Z Corrington
Represented By: Paul Karl Lukacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?