Brown v. Boe
Petitioner: Reshaud Todd Brown
Respondent: Jeri Boe
Case Number: 2:2019cv01977
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Peterson, filed by Reshaud Todd Brown. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account, #4 Notice from Court re IFP Deficiency)**57 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Reshaud Brown, Prisoner ID: 312949)(ST)
January 21, 2020 IFP deficiency corrected **DO NOT PRINT**(Reshaud Brown, Prisoner ID: 312949)(ST)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The "Certification" section on the second page of the IFP form must be completed by the facility where you are currently housed. A copy of the original IFP submitted is attached for your convenience. Filer has until 1/27/2020 to correct (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Reshaud Brown, Prisoner ID: 312949)(ST)
December 24, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Reshaud Todd Brown. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account)**59 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Reshaud Brown, Prisoner ID: 312949)(ST)
December 24, 2019 IFP deficiency corrected in part. **DO NOT PRINT**(Reshaud Brown, Prisoner ID: 312949)(ST)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months.- Signature is missing from the document(s). Please sign as appropriate.- ***Page two must be signed by Financial Officer*** Filer has until 1/3/2020 to correct (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Reshaud Brown, Prisoner ID: 312949)(SG)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Reshaud Todd Brown. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit)**53 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Reshaud Brown, Prisoner ID: 312949)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Boe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeri Boe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reshaud Todd Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?