Pacific Woodtech Corporation v. Semsak
Plaintiff: Pacific Woodtech Corporation
Defendant: Daniel Semsak
Case Number: 2:2019cv01984
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time of Temporary Injunction. Dkt. No. 26. The Court hereby GRANTS the motion. The Temporary Injunction which the Court previously ordered to expire on January 31, 2020, Dkt. No. 22, shall now continue in effect until February 29, 2020.Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(RM)
January 10, 2020 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Temporary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff Pacific Woodtech Corporation. Noting Date 1/10/2020, (Shore, James)
January 10, 2020 Filing 25 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5. (Shore, James)
December 30, 2019 Filing 24 Pacific Woodtech Corporation's ANSWER to #23 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Pacific Woodtech Corporation.(Shore, James)
December 24, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Pacific Woodtech Corporation by Daniel Semsak.(Haglund, Michael)
December 17, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein- Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: James Shore; Def Counsel: Eric Brickenstein; CR: Andrea Ramirez; TRO Hearing held on 12/17/2019. The court conducted a hearing this day, December 17, 2019, at which the parties appeared represented by counsel to discuss the terms of the Court's Temporary Restraining Order granted on December 6, 2019. Dkt. No. 11. The parties have agreed to the extension of the terms of the TRO in the form of a Temporary Injunction while they negotiate the protocol for the inspection of Defendant Daniel Semsak's home and work computers. The Court, therefore, hereby converts the TRO to a Temporary Injunction under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a). The Temporary Injunction shall continue in effect until January 31, 2020. The parties are hereby ordered to update the Court on the progress of their negotiations no later than January 10, 2020. (RM)
December 16, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING TIME. The Hearing time has been changed: TRO Hearing set for 12/17/2019 at 10:30 AM PST in Courtroom 16106 before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(RM)
December 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING - TRO Hearing is rescheduled for 12/17/2019 at 10:00 AM PST in Courtroom 16106 before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(RM)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting #18 motion to reschedule hearing. TRO Hearing is rescheduled for 12/13/2019 at 12:00 PM PST in Courtroom 16106 before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(RM)
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing Set Over, filed by Defendant Daniel Semsak. Noting Date 12/10/2019, (Haglund, Michael)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eric J Brickenstein for Daniel Semsak, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael E Haglund for Daniel Semsak, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eric J. Brickenstein FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Daniel Semsak (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6042991 (Babbitt, Bruce)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael E. Haglund FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Daniel Semsak (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6042950 (Babbitt, Bruce)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Intent to Oppose Motion re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause ; filed by Defendant Daniel Semsak. (Babbitt, Bruce)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bruce P. Babbitt on behalf of Defendant Daniel Semsak. (Babbitt, Bruce)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The parties are to appear for a hearing to discuss the terms of this order via teleconference on Wednesday, December 11, 2019 at 9 a.m. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Daniel Semsak on 12/5/2019, filed by Plaintiff Pacific Woodtech Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shore, James)
December 5, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Judge James L. Robart no longer assigned to the case. (PM)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of James J. Enright filed by Plaintiff Pacific Woodtech Corporation re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Shore, James)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Brandon Leatha filed by Plaintiff Pacific Woodtech Corporation re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Shore, James)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of James M. Shore filed by Plaintiff Pacific Woodtech Corporation re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Shore, James)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause, filed by Plaintiff Pacific Woodtech Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/9/2019, (Shore, James)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Daniel Semsak. (SNP)
December 5, 2019 Judge James L. Robart added. (SNP)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Marc Andre Al for Plaintiff Pacific Woodtech Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mark Andre Al FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Pacific Woodtech Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6037196 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Shore, James)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Itochu Corporation, Other Affiliate Daiken Corporation for Pacific Woodtech Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pacific Woodtech Corporation (Shore, James)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Theft of Trade Secrets, Breaches of Duties of Loyalty/Confidentiality, and Replevin against defendant(s) Daniel Semsak with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6036628) Attorney James M Shore added to party Pacific Woodtech Corporation(pty:pla), filed by Pacific Woodtech Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Shore, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Woodtech Corporation v. Semsak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Woodtech Corporation
Represented By: Reid E. McEllrath
Represented By: James M Shore
Represented By: Marc Andre Al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Semsak
Represented By: Bruce P. Babbitt
Represented By: Eric J Brickenstein
Represented By: Michael E Haglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?