Dawson et al v. South Correctional Entity et al
Plaintiff: Russel H Dawson, A.R., S.R., Reynaldo Gil, D.R., Jose Marte and I.R.
Defendant: Benda Scott, Pedro Santos, Jane Dore, Brenda Scott, Todd Barker, Christopher Foy, Brittany Martin, Jim Kelly, Joan Kosanke, Nancy Whitney, Jessica Lothrop, Henry Tambe, Aaron Seipp, Rebecca Villacorta, Sally Mukwana, Naphcare Inc, Brandon Heath, Rita Whitman, Billie Stockton, Brooke Wallace, Ethan Glover, South Correctional Entity, William Woo, Colminton Allen, Penny Bartley, Virginia Richardson, Brittany Palmore, Mandi Jaramillo, Brittney Palmore, SCORE, Naphcare John Does 1-10 and SCORE John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv01987
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 45 REPLY, filed by Defendant Naphcare Inc, TO RESPONSE to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P 12(b)(6) (Mandt, Heidi)
January 30, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 8 or in the Alternative to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (f), filed by Defendants Colminton Allen, Todd Barker, Penny Bartley, Jane Dore, Christopher Foy, Ethan Glover, Brandon Heath, Mandi Jaramillo, Jim Kelly, Brittney Palmore, SCORE John Does 1-10, Pedro Santos, Benda Scott, Aaron Seipp, South Correctional Entity, William Woo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/21/2020, (Justice, John)
January 27, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Russel H Dawson, to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P 12(b)(6). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bingham, James)
January 23, 2020 Filing 42 DECLARATION of James Bingham filed by Plaintiff Russel H Dawson re #41 MOTION to Amend Complaint (Bingham, James)
January 23, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Russel H Dawson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/14/2020, (Bingham, James)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez: Length of Trial: *20 days*. Jury Trial is set for 4/12/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 2/18/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 2/18/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/14/2020, Motions due by 11/13/2020, Discovery completed by 12/14/2020, Dispositive motions due by 1/12/2021, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 2/26/2021, Motions in Limine due by 3/15/2021, Pretrial Order due by 3/31/2021, Trial briefs to be submitted by 4/7/2021, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 4/7/2021. (LC)
January 15, 2020 Filing 39 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 20. Filed by Defendants Colminton Allen, Todd Barker, Penny Bartley, Jane Dore, Christopher Foy, Ethan Glover, Brandon Heath, Mandi Jaramillo, Jim Kelly, Brittney Palmore, Pedro Santos, Benda Scott, Aaron Seipp, South Correctional Entity, William Woo.(Estes, Stewart)
January 8, 2020 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Benda Scott mailed on 12/16/2019 (Hoisington-Bingham, Maria)
January 8, 2020 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Ethan Glover mailed on 12/10/2019 (Hoisington-Bingham, Maria)
January 6, 2020 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Brittney Palmore mailed on 12/10/2019 (Hoisington-Bingham, Maria)
January 6, 2020 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Todd Barker mailed on 12/16/2019 (Hoisington-Bingham, Maria)
January 6, 2020 Filing 34 AMENDED NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Stewart Andrew Estes on behalf of Defendants Colminton Allen, Todd Barker, Penny Bartley, Jane Dore, Christopher Foy, Ethan Glover, Brandon Heath, Mandi Jaramillo, Jim Kelly, Brittney Palmore, Pedro Santos, Benda Scott, Aaron Seipp, South Correctional Entity, William Woo. (Estes, Stewart) Modified on 1/7/2020: edited text to indicate this is an Amended Notice (PM).
January 6, 2020 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant William Woo mailed on 12/16/2019 (Hoisington-Bingham, Maria)
January 6, 2020 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Christopher Foy mailed on 12/16/2019 (Hoisington-Bingham, Maria)
January 6, 2020 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Brandon Heath mailed on 12/16/2019 (Hoisington-Bingham, Maria)
January 3, 2020 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jane Dore mailed on 12/10/2019 (Hoisington-Bingham, Maria)
January 3, 2020 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Mandi Jaramillo mailed on 12/16/2019 (Hoisington-Bingham, Maria)
January 3, 2020 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jim Kelly mailed on 12/16/2019 (Hoisington-Bingham, Maria)
January 2, 2020 Filing 27 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John E Justice on behalf of Defendants Colminton Allen, Todd Barker, Penny Bartley, Jane Dore, Christopher Foy, Ethan Glover, Brandon Heath, Mandi Jaramillo, Jim Kelly, Brittney Palmore, SCORE John Does 1-10, Pedro Santos, Benda Scott, Aaron Seipp, South Correctional Entity, William Woo. (Justice, John) Modified on 1/3/2020 to identify as Amended (PM).
January 2, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Colminton Allen mailed on 12/10/2019 (Hoisington-Bingham, Maria)
January 2, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Aaron Seipp mailed on 12/10/2019 (Hoisington-Bingham, Maria)
December 31, 2019 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P 12(b)(6) (Mandt, Heidi)
December 31, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Heidi L Mandt on behalf of Defendants Joan Kosanke, Jessica Lothrop, Brittany Martin, Sally Mukwana, Naphcare Inc, Virginia Richardson, Billie Stockton, Henry Tambe, Rebecca Villacorta, Brooke Wallace, Rita Whitman, Nancy Whitney. (Mandt, Heidi)
December 31, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P 12(b)(6), filed by Defendants Joan Kosanke, Jessica Lothrop, Brittany Martin, Sally Mukwana, Naphcare Inc, Naphcare John Does 1-10, Virginia Richardson, Billie Stockton, Henry Tambe, Rebecca Villacorta, Brooke Wallace, Rita Whitman, Nancy Whitney. Noting Date 1/31/2020, (Mandt, Heidi)
December 31, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Naphcare Inc (Mandt, Heidi)
December 27, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Rebecca Villacorta mailed on 12/10/2019 (Mandt, Heidi)
December 27, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Henry Tambe mailed on 12/17/2019 (Mandt, Heidi)
December 27, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Brooke Wallace mailed on 12/10/2019 (Mandt, Heidi)
December 27, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Billie Stockton mailed on 12/10/2019 (Mandt, Heidi)
December 27, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Joan Kosanke mailed on 12/10/2019 (Mandt, Heidi)
December 27, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Brittany Martin mailed on 12/10/2019 (Mandt, Heidi)
December 27, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Sally Mukwana mailed on 12/10/2019 (Mandt, Heidi)
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Pedro Santos mailed on 12/10/2019 (Hoisington-Bingham, Maria)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Nancy Whitney mailed on 12/17/2019 (Mandt, Heidi)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Penny Bartley mailed on 12/10/2019 (Marshall, Toby)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Virginia Richardson mailed on 12/10/2019 (Mandt, Heidi)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Rita Whitman mailed on 12/10/2019 (Mandt, Heidi)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jessica Lothrop mailed on 12/10/2019 (Mandt, Heidi)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 1/27/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/13/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/21/2020. (LC)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Stewart Andrew Estes on behalf of Defendant South Correctional Entity. (Estes, Stewart)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Counsel John E. Justice, on behalf of Defendant South Correctional Entity, on 12/10/2019. (Marshall, Toby)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on NaphCare, Inc. on 12/10/2019, filed by Plaintiffs A.R., D.R., Russel H Dawson, Reynaldo Gil, I.R., Jose Marte, S.R.. (Marshall, Toby)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John E Justice on behalf of Defendant South Correctional Entity. (Justice, John)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Colminton Allen, Todd Barker, Penny Bartley, Jane Dore, Christopher Foy, Ethan Glover, Brandon Heath, Mandi Jaramillo, Jim Kelly, Joan Kosanke, Jessica Lothrop, Brittany Martin, Sally Mukwana, Naphcare Inc, Brittany Palmore, Virginia Richardson, Pedro Santos, Benda Scott, Aaron Seipp, South Correctional Entity, Billie Stockton, Henry Tambe, Rebecca Villacorta, Brooke Wallace, Rita Whitman, Nancy Whitney, and William Woo. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons)(GT)
December 6, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (GT)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6038212) Attorney Toby James Marshall added to party A.R.(pty:pla), Attorney Toby James Marshall added to party D.R.(pty:pla), Attorney Toby James Marshall added to party Russel H Dawson(pty:pla), Attorney Toby James Marshall added to party Reynaldo Gil(pty:pla), Attorney Toby James Marshall added to party I.R.(pty:pla), Attorney Toby James Marshall added to party Jose Marte(pty:pla), Attorney Toby James Marshall added to party S.R.(pty:pla), filed by I.R., S.R., Russel H Dawson, A.R., D.R., Jose Marte, Reynaldo Gil. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons)(Marshall, Toby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson et al v. South Correctional Entity et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benda Scott
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Santos
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Dore
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Scott
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Barker
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Foy
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Martin
Represented By: Heidi L Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Kelly
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Kosanke
Represented By: Heidi L Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Whitney
Represented By: Heidi L Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Lothrop
Represented By: Heidi L Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Tambe
Represented By: Heidi L Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Seipp
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Villacorta
Represented By: Heidi L Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Mukwana
Represented By: Heidi L Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naphcare Inc
Represented By: Heidi L Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Heath
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Whitman
Represented By: Heidi L Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billie Stockton
Represented By: Heidi L Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke Wallace
Represented By: Heidi L Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan Glover
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Correctional Entity
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Woo
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colminton Allen
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Bartley
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Richardson
Represented By: Heidi L Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Palmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandi Jaramillo
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittney Palmore
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCORE
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naphcare John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCORE John Does 1-10
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russel H Dawson
Represented By: Jeffrey C Jones
Represented By: James Nathan Bingham
Represented By: James T Anderson, III
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Maria Hoisington-Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.
Represented By: Jeffrey C Jones
Represented By: James Nathan Bingham
Represented By: James T Anderson, III
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Maria Hoisington-Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.R.
Represented By: Jeffrey C Jones
Represented By: James Nathan Bingham
Represented By: James T Anderson, III
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Maria Hoisington-Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynaldo Gil
Represented By: Jeffrey C Jones
Represented By: James Nathan Bingham
Represented By: James T Anderson, III
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Maria Hoisington-Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.R.
Represented By: Jeffrey C Jones
Represented By: James Nathan Bingham
Represented By: James T Anderson, III
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Maria Hoisington-Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Marte
Represented By: Jeffrey C Jones
Represented By: James Nathan Bingham
Represented By: James T Anderson, III
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Maria Hoisington-Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.R.
Represented By: Jeffrey C Jones
Represented By: James Nathan Bingham
Represented By: James T Anderson, III
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Maria Hoisington-Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?