Thompson v. QuoteWizard.com LLC
Plaintiff: Neil Thompson
Defendant: QuoteWizard.com, LLC and QuoteWizard.com LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02004
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 21 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Rule 26 Deadlines, filed by Defendant QuoteWizard.com LLC. Noting Date 2/6/2020, (Downs, Jacob)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting parties' #19 Second Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Clerk's Office shall update the docket to reflect that the deadline for defendant to file a responsive pleading to plaintiffs complaint is February 20, 2020. Signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (TH)
February 3, 2020 Filing 19 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , filed by Defendant QuoteWizard.com LLC. Noting Date 2/3/2020, (Downs, Jacob)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Parties' #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: The deadline for defendant to file a responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint is 2/6/2020. Signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.(MW)
January 2, 2020 Filing 17 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant QuoteWizard.com LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kazerounian, Abbas)
December 31, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph P. Corr on behalf of Defendant QuoteWizard.com LLC. (Corr, Joseph)
December 31, 2019 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant QuoteWizard.com LLC. Noting Date 12/31/2019, (Downs, Jacob)
December 30, 2019 JSR due NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 2/10/2020. (KAM)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 2/10/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/21/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/3/2020, by Judge J Richard Creatura. NOTE: A trial date will be set by the assigned District Judge, the Honorable Richard A Jones, if the case is not resolved by settlement or dispositive motion. (KAM)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Judge J Richard Creatura for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent LendingTree, LLC for QuoteWizard.com LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by QuoteWizard.com LLC (Downs, Jacob)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christine M Kingston for defendant QuoteWizard.com LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kevin P Polansky for Defendant QuoteWizard.com LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christine M. Kingston FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant QuoteWizard.com LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6067445 (Downs, Jacob)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kevin P. Polansky FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant QuoteWizard.com LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6067417 (Downs, Jacob)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant QuoteWizard.com LLC on 12/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kazerounian, Abbas)
December 27, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, QuoteWizard.com LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/3/2020. (GMR)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 1/3/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jacob M Downs on behalf of Defendant QuoteWizard.com LLC. (Downs, Jacob)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant QuoteWizard.com LLC. (GT)
December 10, 2019 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (GT)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Abbas Kazerounian. Filed by Plaintiff Neil Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kazerounian, Abbas)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) QuoteWizard.com, LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6041893), filed by Neil Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kazerounian, Abbas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. QuoteWizard.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QuoteWizard.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QuoteWizard.com LLC
Represented By: Christine M Kingston
Represented By: Jacob M Downs
Represented By: Kevin P Polansky
Represented By: Joseph P. Corr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Thompson
Represented By: Abbas Kazerounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?