Yee v. Assurance IQ LLC
Plaintiff: Eva Marie Yee
Defendant: Assurance IQ, LLC and Assurance IQ LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02010
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated per Plaintiff's #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case). See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (MW)
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Eva Marie Yee (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kazerounian, Abbas)
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Eva Marie Yee (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kazerounian, Abbas)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Based upon the Parties' #6 Stipulation, it is hereby ordered that: (1) the Court shall set Plaintiff's deadline to file her motion for Class Certification after the parties file the combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan on or before 2/10/2020, and (2) Defendant shall have until 1/28/2020 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Britenae M.C. Pierce on behalf of Defendant Assurance IQ LLC. (Pierce, Britenae)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadline for Plaintiff to File Motion for Class Certification (L.R. 23) and Extending Defendant's Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by parties (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kazerounian, Abbas)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Assurance IQ LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kazerounian, Abbas)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Assurance IQ LLC on 12/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kazerounian, Abbas)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/10/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/27/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/10/2020, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant, Assurance IQ, LLC. (SNP)
December 10, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SNP)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Assurance IQ, LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6042401), filed by Eva Marie Yee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kazerounian, Abbas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yee v. Assurance IQ LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurance IQ, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurance IQ LLC
Represented By: Britenae M.C. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Marie Yee
Represented By: Abbas Kazerounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?