Behaviour Interactive Inc v. Tianjin UEGame Co Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Behaviour Interactive Inc. and Behaviour Interactive Inc
Defendant: Dai Lu, Tianjin UEGame Co. Ltd. and Tianjin Uegame Co Ltd
Case Number: 2:2019cv02068
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/20/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/27/2020, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (CDA)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons)(CDA)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint Summons to Dai Lu by Plaintiff Behaviour Interactive Inc (Lawrence, Paul)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint Summons to Tianjin Uegame Co. Ltd. by Plaintiff Behaviour Interactive Inc (Lawrence, Paul)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Behaviour Interactive Inc. (Lawrence, Paul)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)
December 23, 2019 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (CDA)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint Summons to Dai Lu by Plaintiff Behaviour Interactive Inc. (Lawrence, Paul)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint Summons to Tianjin Uegame Co. Ltd. by Plaintiff Behaviour Interactive Inc. (Lawrence, Paul)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6060303) Attorney Paul J Lawrence added to party Behaviour Interactive Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Behaviour Interactive Inc..(Lawrence, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Behaviour Interactive Inc v. Tianjin UEGame Co Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Behaviour Interactive Inc.
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Behaviour Interactive Inc
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dai Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tianjin UEGame Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tianjin Uegame Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?