Tobias v. Federal Government
Plaintiff: Andrew Tobias
Defendant: Federal Government
Case Number: 2:2019cv02095
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's claims and closing case. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via USPS
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Plaintiff to file a Response no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via USPS
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against defendant Federal Government (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Andrew Tobias. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (PM)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via USPS
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. CC to plaintiff via US Mail. (GT)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Brian A Tsuchida, filed by Andrew Tobias. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(GT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tobias v. Federal Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Tobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?