United States of America v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Aaron Williams, III
Garnishee: Miles Sand & Gravel
Case Number: 2:2019mc00129
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY: Pursuant to defendant's objections to plaintiff's Application For Writ of Garnishment in case number 2:19-mc-129 RSL, and the Court's order to assign a new civil case number, the case has been randomly assigned to Hon. Thomas S. Zilly, case number 2:19-cv-1631-TSZ. All future pleadings must now bear the newly assigned case number. (copy of docket report sent to defendant via USPS) (GT)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Request filed by Aaron Williams, III by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (cc: defendant via USPS) (GT)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR HEARING by Defendant Aaron Williams, III re #3 Writ (CDA)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America (Forsyth, Kyle)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America (Forsyth, Kyle)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO DEFENDANT/JUDGMENT DEBTOR From Clerk, United States District Court re #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment. (GT)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 WRIT of Continuing Garnishment Electronically Issued. (GT)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT and Notice to Defendant/Judgment Debtor signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik re #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, filed by United States of America. (GT)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment against defendant Aaron Williams, III in the amount of $ 67,055.20 (NO FEE REQUIRED), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dawn Fernandez in Support of Application for a Writ of Continuing Garnishment, #2 PROPOSED Order to Issue a Writ of Continuing Garnishment, #3 PROPOSED Writ of Continuing Garnishment, #4 Notiec to Defendant / Judgment Debtor From Clerk, United States District Court, #5 Email)(GT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Williams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Miles Sand & Gravel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?