In re: Daniel Louis Dvorkin
In Re: Daniel Dvorkin
Case Number: 2:2019rd00050
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Walter T McGovern
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (DS)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Reciprocal Discipline suspending Daniel Louis Dvorkin from the practice of law before this Court by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Order e-mailed to Clerk of US District Court, EDWA, Clerk of US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Clerk of US Bankruptcy Court, WDWA and WSBA. Changed admission status in ECF to suspended. Mailed Order to address on docket. (DS)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Mail addressed to 500 108th Ave NE, Ste 215, Bellevue, WA 98004 returned as Undeliverable re #2 Order to Show Cause. (DS)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Show Cause Response due by 7/15/2019. Mailed Order to addresses on docket. (DS)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Suspension from the Supreme Court of Washington, Order No. 201,854-8, Administrative Suspension of Attorneys for Failure to Comply with 2019 Licensing Requirements. (DS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Daniel Louis Dvorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Daniel Dvorkin
Represented By: Daniel L Dvorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?